Member Case
Lead case is: 8:20-bk-11507

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:20-bk-11508
Case Filed:May 26, 2020
Terminated:Apr 05, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hytera America Incorporated
3315 Commerce Pkwy
Miramar, FL 33025-3954
Represented By
John W Lucas
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Monday, July 15, 2024
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Mon 07/15 3:58 PM
Judge Scott C Clarkson added to case. Involvement of Judge Erithe A. Smith Terminated (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
38 38 court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 04/05 12:17 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. Related [+] (The Final Decree and Order Closing the Chapter 11 Case Pursuant to Section 350(A) of the Bankruptcy Code was entered in the Lead Case, HCA West, Inc - 20-11507 ES on 12/27/2022) (SD8)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc,9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Monday, January 24, 2022
37 37 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Mon 01/24 2:15 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 8 20-11507 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Rosell, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
36 36 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 12/17 3:02 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Rosell, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
35 35 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Mon 11/22 12:11 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 10/31/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Rosell, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
34 34 misc Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Fri 10/29 10:33 AM
Amended Schedule A/B for Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Rosell, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
33 33 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 10/20 3:51 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Rosell, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 09/24 12:03 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2021 (Amended to Add Holographic Signature) [Relates to Docket No. 30] Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation
Friday, September 17, 2021
31 31 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 09/17 3:02 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Related [+] (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 30 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc
30 30 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 09/17 12:29 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08 31-2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Rosell, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
29 29 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 08/18 2:17 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation
Monday, July 26, 2021
28 28 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 07/26 11:23 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 10 Filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Hewett, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
27 27 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 07/22 4:16 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation
Friday, June 18, 2021
26 26 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 06/18 7:47 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 05/31/2021 for the Month Ending: 05/31/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
25 25 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 05/19 4:20 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 11. For the Month Ending April 30, 2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
24 24 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 04/20 11:36 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 10. For the Month Ending 3/31/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
23 23 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 03/17 2:55 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 9. For the Month Ending 02/28/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
22 22 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 02/17 12:27 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 8. For the Month Ending 1/31/2021 Filed by Debtor HAI East, Inc. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
21 21 court X - Document (Generic) Mon 02/08 6:52 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption ofthis case be changed in accordance with the corporate name change of[Hytera America Incorporated] to [HAI East, Inc]. [See order entered in the Lead Case: HCA West, Inc - 8 20-11507 ES - Doc. #431] (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
20 20 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 01/20 11:15 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 7. For the Month Ending 12/31/2020 Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
19 19 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 12/16 3:03 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 6. For the Month Ending 11/30/2020 Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
18 18 misc Monthly Operating Report Thu 11/19 3:36 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 5. For the Month Ending 10/31/2020 Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
17 17 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 10/21 1:07 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 4. For the Month Ending 09/30/2020 Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
16 16 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 09/15 12:51 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 3. For the Month Ending 8/31/2020 Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
15 15 misc Monthly Operating Report Mon 08/17 10:58 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 2. For the Month Ending 7/31/2020 Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
14 14 claims Withdrawal of Claim Fri 08/07 11:35 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 7 Filed by Hytera Communications Corp., LTD. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Rick
Friday, July 17, 2020
13 13 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 07/17 10:54 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1. For the Month Ending June 30, 2020 Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
12 12 misc Notice to Pay Court Costs Due (BNC Option) Wed 07/15 1:03 PM
Notice to Pay Court Costs Due Sent To: John W Lucas, Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Total Amount Due $0 . (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
11 11 161 pgs misc Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Wed 07/01 2:50 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated Related [+]. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Friday, June 05, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 06/05 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1326. Notice Date 06/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
9 9 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Wed 06/03 9:37 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/7/2020 at 01:00 PM at UST-SA1, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-919-0527, PARTICIPANT CODE:2240227. (Beezer, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/29 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, May 28, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 05/28 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 05/28 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
5 5 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Wed 05/27 10:43 AM
Order Granting Motion To Approve Joint Administration Of Cases. Lead Case: Hytera Communications America (West), Inc. (Case Number: 8:20-bk-11507-ES) Jointly Administered With Member Cases: Hytera America Incorporated (Case Number: 8:20-bk-11508-ES) and HYT North America, Inc. (Case Number: 8:20-bk-11509-ES) (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/27/2020. (Bolte, Nickie)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 05/26 4:27 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Attorney address on the petition PDF does not match CM/ECF. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION ON THIS CASE, HOWEVER, THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE PROPER CHANGE OF ADDRESS, IF APPLICABLE. Related [+] (Shimizu, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 05/26 4:26 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules/statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Judge was reassigned due to prior case. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (Shimizu, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated
2 2 motion Joint Administration (motion) Tue 05/26 4:21 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Cases Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1015(b) and Local Bankrutpcy Rule 9013-1(q) Filed by Debtor Hytera America Incorporated (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 220 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 05/26 2:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Hytera America Incorporated Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 06/9/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 06/9/2020. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 06/9/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 06/9/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 06/9/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 06/9/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 06/9/2020. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 06/9/2020. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 06/9/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 06/9/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 06/9/2020. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 06/9/2020. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 06/9/2020. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 06/9/2020. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 06/9/2020. Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature - Form 119 due by 06/9/2020. Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (Form 2800) due 06/9/2020. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 06/9/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 06/9/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 06/9/2020. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/23/2020. Disclosure Statement due by 09/23/2020. (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 05/26 2:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:20-bk-11508) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51161075. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Tue 05/26 3:52 PM
Judge Erithe A. Smith added to case (affiliated case 8:20-bk-11507-ES). Involvement of Judge Theodor Albert Terminated (Corona, Heidi)
Related: [-]