Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:14-cv-01044
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 01, 2014
Terminated:Feb 02, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 10:06 PM EST
Defendant
Lori S. Johnson
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fred G. Portofe
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
West Bay Professionals, L.L.C.
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alka D. Tiwary
Represented By
Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr
Dixit Law Firm, PA
contact info
Defendant
The Health & Wellness Clinic of Chiropractic LLC
Defendant
Range Road Professionals, L.L.C.
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Bret M. Feldman
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fred F. Portofe
Defendant
Donald Mueller
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jose Morales
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Sarah J. Manthey
Johnson, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, LLP
contact info
Defendant
J2 Engineering, Inc.
Represented By
Howard A. Caplan
Lewis, Longman & Walker, PA
contact info
Defendant
Brian Harris
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Forino
Represented By
Michael P. Brundage
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Florida Department of Revenue
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Alka D. Tiwary, D.D.S., P.A.
Represented By
Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr
Dixit Law Firm, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Regions Bank
an Alabama banking corporation Jeanette Pillitteri 201 Milan Parkway
Birmingham, AL 35211
Represented By
L. Geoffrey Young
Adams & Reese, LLP
contact info
James Marshall Moorhead
Adams & Reese, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bayside Family Eyecare, LLC
Terminated: 07/17/2014
Represented By
David Blum
David Blum, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
111 111 order Order dismissing case Tue 02/02 2:37 PM
ORDER dismissing case. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/2/2016. (APV)
Related: [-]