Lewis v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-04048 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 22, 2020 4:04 AM EST |
ADR Provider
Teva Women's Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ADR Provider
Teva Women's Health, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CooperSurgical, Inc.
95 Corporate Drive
Trumbell, CT 06611 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
41 Moores Road
Frazer, PA 19355 |
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Women's Heath, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Womens Health, Inc.
425 Privet Road
Horsham, PA 19044 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Cooper Companies, Inc.
6140 Stoneridge Mall Rd Suite 590
Pleasanton, CA 94588 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Domonique Lewis
24B Gates Rd
Worcester, MA 01603 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
83 | 83
transfer
MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order
Tue 01/05 2:28 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/29/2020) (sjo) |
|
transfer
MDL Transfer Out
Tue 01/05 2:31 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (sjo) |
||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Wed 01/06 9:50 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:21-cv-00039, filed on 01/05/2021. (sjo) |