Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Charlene Edwards Honeywel
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:20-cv-01245
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:May 29, 2020
Terminated:Mar 22, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 25, 2020 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
WTS International, Inc.
3200 Tower Oaks Professional Park
Rockville, MD 20852
Represented By
Emily Chalela Ayvazian
Jackson Lewis, PC
contact info
Laura E. Prather
Jackson Lewis, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Austyn Mattson
Represented By
Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Christopher S Prater
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Seth Musselman
Represented By
Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Christopher S Prater
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Rando
Represented By
Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Christopher S Prater
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Rivera
Represented By
Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Christopher S Prater
Pollard PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 17, 2023
46 46 1 pgs order Order dismissing case Mon 04/17 3:54 PM
ORDER dismissing case. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/17/2023. (BGS)
Related: [-]
45 45 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Mon 04/17 2:35 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
44 44 misc Status report Wed 04/12 6:02 PM
STATUS report re DE 43 by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
43 43 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/29 9:59 AM
ORDERED: Within fourteen (14) days, Plaintiffs shall file a status report advising the Court if they have initiated arbitration and the status of same. If Plaintiffs have not yet initiated arbitration, Plaintiffs shall advise if they intend to pursue arbitration of the claims that remain in dispute. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/29/2023. (JDE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/15 7:48 PM
NOTICE by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera re41 Order (Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
41 41 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/08 2:44 PM
ORDERED: Within seven (7) days, Plaintiffs shall file a status report advising the Court if they have initiated arbitration and the status of same. If Plaintiffs have not yet initiated arbitration, Plaintiffs shall file a response to the Court's order explaining why arbitration has not yet been initiated, what steps Plaintiffs have taken in the past year to initiate the arbitration, and whether Plaintiffs intend to pursue arbitration of their claims. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/8/2022. (JDE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
40 40 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/02 7:29 PM
NOTICE by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera re38 Order (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
39 39 misc Status report Wed 10/27 11:41 AM
STATUS report Defendant's Status Report Regarding Arbitration by WTS International, Inc.. (Ayvazian, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
38 38 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/26 11:14 AM
ORDERED: The parties shall advise the Court within SEVEN (7) DAYS of the date of this Order as to the status of the arbitration. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/26/2021. (JDE)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 20, 2021
37 37 21 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Sat 03/20 10:08 AM
ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration 16 is GRANTED. The parties shall submit all claims asserted in the Amended Complaint to arbitration in accordance with the Arbitration Agreement. This action is STAYED pending arbitration of Plaintiffs' claims. The parties shall file a notice informing the Court that the arbitration has concluded, or that their dispute has otherwise been resolved, within fourteen (14) days of either of such event. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and administratively CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/20/2021. (JDE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/02 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Change in Local Rules. (BGS)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 31, 2021
35 35 adr Mediation report Sun 01/31 11:16 AM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 01/29/2021. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Daisley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
34 34 respoth Response Mon 12/21 3:57 PM
RESPONSE re30 Affidavit filed by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. (Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
33 33 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 12/14 5:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a response of no more than seven (7) pages on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/14/2020. (CEH)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Mon 12/14 5:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Response to Document #30 (Affidavit of Marco Chavez in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration) by All Plaintiffs. (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
31 31 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 12/03 4:08 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 29, 2021 beginning at 1:30 p.m. before Robert Daisley, Esq.. (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
30 30 misc Affidavit Mon 11/30 3:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Marco Chavez re:16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by WTS International, Inc..(Prather, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
29 29 notice Notice of appearance Wed 11/18 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Chalela Ayvazian on behalf of WTS International, Inc. (Ayvazian, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
28 28 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 11/16 1:53 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell: MOTION HEARING held on 11/16/2020 re16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by WTS International, Inc. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (BGS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
27 27 order Case management and scheduling order Thu 11/12 8:43 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/2/2021, Dispositive motions due by 8/6/2021, Pretrial statement due by 11/16/2021, All other motions due by 11/23/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 3:45 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/3/2022 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/31/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/12/2020. (BGS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
26 26 notice Notice of hearing on motion Tue 10/27 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2020 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. The hearing scheduled for NOVEMBER 16, 2020 will be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE. The Clerk will be sending everyone an invitation to the meeting via email. If you have any questions, please contact courtroom deputy, Bettye Samuel, at Bettye_Samuel@flmd.uscourts.gov. Although the hearing is taking place by video, all parties should dress appropriately for this Court proceeding. Furthermore, the parties are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 4.11(b) the taking of photographs, the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited.(BGS)
Related: [-]
25 25 order *Order pdf Tue 10/27 4:23 PM
ORDERED: Upon review of Plaintiffs' Response and the Amended Complaint, the Court concludes that jurisdiction has been adequately alleged. Accordingly, the Court will take no further action on the Order to Show Cause 7 and it is discharged. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/27/2020. (JDE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
24 24 misc Case Management Report Fri 09/25 6:44 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Thu 09/24 6:24 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by WTS International, Inc.. Related case(s): n (Prather, Laura)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Thu 09/24 6:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by WTS International, Inc.. (Prather, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
21 21 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/11 8:38 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Motion. The parties may conduct their case management conference via video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/11/2020. (JMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/10 3:58 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Permit Case Management Report Conference to be Conducted Via Video Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
19 19 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Fri 08/14 1:47 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. Related case(s): no (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/10 6:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera.(Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Declarations
Monday, August 03, 2020
17 17 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Mon 08/03 11:19 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order, 15 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
16 16 motion Compel Mon 07/27 5:21 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by WTS International, Inc..(Prather, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 07/27 4:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Document out of time. Plaintiffs shall file their Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/27/2020.(JDE)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
14 14 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Fri 07/24 11:48 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document : Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Out of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Prater, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/13 9:17 AM
NOTICE by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera re12 Amended Complaint Certificate of Service (Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/13 9:03 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against WTS International, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Offer Letter & Proposed Non-Compete Agreement
Monday, July 06, 2020
11 11 order *Order pdf Mon 07/06 3:21 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint within 7 days from the date of this Order. Defendant shall have 14 days to respond to the amended complaint. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/6/2020. (JDE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
10 10 misc Response to order to show cause Thu 07/02 1:27 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re7 Order pdf filed by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera.(Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pollard Declaration
Friday, June 26, 2020
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/26 9:39 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. WTS International, Inc. answer or response due on or before 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/26/2020. (JMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/23 3:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by WTS International, Inc.. (Prather, Laura) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified event type on 6/23/2020 (CTR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
7 7 order *Order pdf Thu 06/18 1:52 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs are directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why the Complaint 1 should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint, which cures the jurisdictional deficiencies, within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Order within the time provided will result in this action being dismissed. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/18/2020. (LJB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
6 6 service Summons returned executed Thu 06/04 4:09 PM
RETURN of service executed on 06/02/2020 by Daniel Rivera, Austyn Mattson, Jason Rando, Seth Musselman as to All Defendants. (Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
5 5 service Summons issued Mon 06/01 11:15 AM
SUMMONS issued as to WTS International, Inc. (TDC)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Interested persons order Mon 06/01 9:33 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/1/2020. (BGS)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Related case order and track 2 notice Mon 06/01 9:32 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/1/2020. (BGS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/01 8:38 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1245-T-36AEP. (SJB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/29 5:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16863842) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Pollard, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Offer Letter & Proposed Non-Compete Agreement,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons