Original Case: 2:17-cv-01043

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-03553
Typecivil / private / civil rights - title vii
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2020
Terminated:Jul 02, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 07, 2021 3:27 AM CDT
Amicus Curiae
EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By
Anne Noel Occhialino
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Defendant - Appellant Cross-Appellee
STEAK 'N SHAKE, INC.
Represented By
Rebecca Jane Bennett
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Monica Levine Lacks
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
HANNAH CORBIN
Represented By
Matthew Gilbert Bruce
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info
Brian D. Spitz
Spitz Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jul 02 2021
OPINION filed : AFFIRMED. Decision not for publication. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Chief Judge; David W. McKeague and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judge. [20-3519, 20-3553]

Docket last updated: 07/07/2021 3:27 AM CDT
Monday, June 01, 2020
The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Hannah Corbin. Transcript needed: y. (VLP)
Related: [-]