Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-36572

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03090
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2020
Terminated:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Regina Dawn Reams
1458 Donavon Mill Lane
Powhatan, VA 23139
Represented By
Regina Dawn Reams
contact info
Plaintiff
Village Bank
Williams Mullen 200 South 10th Street, Suite 1600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Bennett Thomas Willoughby Eastham
Williams Mullen
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Monday, October 17, 2022
43 43 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Mon 10/17 9:38 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
42 42 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 10/03 12:13 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)41 Order dismissing adversary proceeding
Friday, September 30, 2022
41 41 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Court Action) Fri 09/30 8:25 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Village Bank, Village Bank
Thursday, August 18, 2022
40 40 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Failure to Prosecute Fri 08/19 12:12 AM
Notice of Failure to Prosecute Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 39 Notice of Failure to Prosecute Issued
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
39 39 court Failure to Prosecute Notice Request Tue 08/16 4:58 PM
Notice of Failure to Prosecute Issued Related [+] Failure to Prosecute Disposition due by 8/30/2022. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)29 Motion for Approval of Agreement filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams, 34 Hearing held
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
38 38 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Thu 02/11 12:13 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)37 Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney
Monday, February 08, 2021
37 37 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Mon 02/08 8:48 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Related [+]Chad Lee Edwards terminated; Carolyn Anne Bedi for Regina Dawn Reams, added (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 36
Friday, January 15, 2021
36 36 motion Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Fri 01/15 3:38 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Carolyn Anne Bedi of Bedi Legal, P.C. on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Bedi, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
35 35 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Thu 01/07 12:20 PM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to Chad L. Edwards regarding Motion, Notice of Hearing; Notice of motion omitted. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)33 Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
34 34 court Hearing held Wed 01/06 12:40 PM
Hearing held; Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement to be filed in Bankruptcy Case Related [+] Appearances: Chad Lee Edwards, Augustus C. Epps (garyl)
Related: [-] 29 Motion for Approval of Agreement filed by Regina Dawn Reams
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
33 33 motion Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Tue 01/05 6:48 PM
Motion to Withdraw Attorney filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 12/16 2:02 PM
Corrected Notice of Hearing on Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Related [+] filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2021 at 11:30 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-] related document(s)29 Motion for Approval of Agreement filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams,30 Notice of Hearing filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
31 31 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Tue 12/15 1:54 PM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to Chad L. Edwards regarding Motion, Notice of Hearing; Incorrect hearing date listed in order.. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)30 Notice of Hearing filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams
Monday, December 14, 2020
30 30 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/14 3:28 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Related [+] filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2021 at 11:30 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-] related document(s)29 Motion for Approval of Agreement filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams
29 29 motion Approval of Agreement Mon 12/14 2:53 PM
Motion for Approval of Agreement filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
28 28 court Trial Cancelled Tue 10/27 12:54 PM
Trial Cancelled; Complaint and Counterclaim SETTLED per Gus Epps for Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant, Village Bank and Chad Edwards for Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff, Regina Reams; Order to be submitted. Related [+] (garyl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Village Bank,6 Answer to Complaint filed by Counter-Claimant Regina Dawn Reams, Defendant Regina Dawn Reams, Counterclaim,16 Amended Answer filed by Counter-Claimant Regina Dawn Reams, Defendant Regina Dawn Reams.
27 27 court Hearing Cancelled Tue 10/27 12:36 PM
Hearing Cancelled; SETTLED; Order to be submitted per Gus Epps Related [+] (garyl)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
26 26 7 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 10/21 11:22 PM
Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Response Wed 10/21 11:14 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank, Village Bank
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/07 2:43 PM
Notice of Hearing (Notice of Motion and Hearing Thereon) Related [+] filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank, Village Bank
23 23 15 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 10/07 2:25 PM
Memorandum (Memorandum in Support of Village Bank's Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Amended Counterclaim) Related [+] filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank, Village Bank
22 22 motion Dismiss Pleading Wed 10/07 2:23 PM
Motion to Dismiss Pleading (Village Bank's Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Amended Counterclaim) Related [+] filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Amended Answer filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams
Sunday, September 20, 2020
21 21 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 09/21 12:16 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Order on Motion to Dismiss Pleading
Friday, September 18, 2020
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Pleading Fri 09/18 2:09 PM
Consent Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Pleading Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
19 19 court Hearing Cancelled Tue 09/15 3:32 PM
Hearing Cancelled; Consent order submitted Related [+] (garyl)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank
Monday, September 14, 2020
18 18 motion Authorize Mon 09/14 2:53 PM
Consent Motion to Authorize (Consent Motion Seeking Order Permitting Filing of Amended Answer and Counterclaim and Denying Motion to Dismiss) Related [+] filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank, Village Bank,16 Amended Answer filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams
Thursday, September 10, 2020
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/10 1:45 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Amended Answer filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams
Monday, September 07, 2020
16 16 answer Amended Answer Mon 09/07 3:24 PM
Amended Answer Related [+] filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Answer to Complaint filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams, Counterclaim
Thursday, September 03, 2020
15 15 order Pre-Trial Order Thu 09/03 8:59 AM
Second Pre-Trial Order; Related [+] Trial to be held on 1/25/2021 at 10:00 AM. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the Trial shall be conducted by remote video conference via Zoom for Government in accordance with Richmond General Order 20-5. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Village Bank, Village Bank,9 Pre-Trial Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
14 14 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 09/01 3:48 PM
Consent Protective Order Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, August 20, 2020
13 13 motion Protective Order Thu 08/20 4:04 PM
Motion for Protective Order With Proposed Consent Order Attached filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/28 1:36 PM
Notice of Hearing (Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Thereon) Related [+] filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. Hearing scheduled for 9/16/2020 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank, Village Bank
Friday, July 24, 2020
11 11 10 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 07/24 3:09 PM
Memorandum in Support of Village Bank's Motion to Dismiss Debtor's First and Second Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Related [+] filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Dismiss Pleading filed by Village Bank, Village Bank
10 10 motion Dismiss Pleading Fri 07/24 3:01 PM
Motion to Dismiss Pleading (Village Bank's Motion to Dismiss Two Counts of Debtor's Counterclaim Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7012 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) Related [+] filed by Augustus C. Epps Jr. of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. (Epps, Augustus)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Answer to Complaint filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams, Counterclaim
9 9 order Pre-Trial Order Fri 07/24 2:43 PM
Pre-Trial Order; Related [+] Trial set for 1/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Village Bank, Village Bank
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
8 8 court Pre-Trial Conference Held; Trial Set Tue 07/21 2:09 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled; One Day Trial Set by agreement per Gus Epps and Chad Edwards Related [+] Trial set for 01/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (oliverb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Village Bank
Monday, July 06, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/06 4:01 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Answer to Complaint filed by Regina Dawn Reams, Regina Dawn Reams, Counterclaim
6 6 answer|cmp None|Counterclaim Mon 07/06 3:49 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Village Bank filed by Chad Lee Edwards of Edwards Law, PLC on behalf of Regina Dawn Reams. (Edwards, Chad)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
5 5 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 06/03 12:57 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Regina Dawn Reams Answer Due 7/6/2020 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 11:30 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia, (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Village Bank,4 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
4 4 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 06/02 1:59 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Regina Dawn Reams Answer Due 7/2/2020 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 11:30 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia, (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Village Bank
Monday, June 01, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 06/01 4:20 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 20-03090 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 32605995, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Mon 06/01 4:13 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Related [+] filed by Bennett Thomas Willoughby Eastham of Williams Mullen on behalf of Village Bank. (Eastham, Bennett)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Village Bank
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 06/01 4:10 PM
Adversary case 20-03090 Complaint against Regina Dawn Reams filed by Village Bank. Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (65 (Dischargeability - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-36572 (Eastham, Bennett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-4