Fox et al v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-03650 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:20-cv-10532 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 29, 2020 3:04 AM PST |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruthann Fox
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-10532. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Tue 06/02 10:45 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of Massachusetts, 1:20-cv-10532-RGS, Fox et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-03650-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 211 cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Case transferred to the Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 5/27/20. Original case file electronically sent to the Clerk in that district. (Pacho, Arnold) | |
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |