Member Case
Lead case is: 3:20-bk-17229

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:20-bk-17228
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Dec 27, 2021

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sea Oaks Golf Club, LLC
99 Golf View Dr
Little Egg Harbor Twp, NJ 08087-4219
Represented By
Timothy P. Neumann
Broege, Neumann, Fischer & Shaver
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Friday, April 01, 2022
57 57 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/02 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
56 56 order Final Decree Wed 03/30 1:39 PM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (pbf)
Related: [-]
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/30 1:40 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (pbf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
55 55 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 03/30 10:55 AM
Copy of Order Granting Motion For Final Decree from Case 20-17229 Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/29/2022. (rms)
Related: [-]