Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Referred: Gina L Simms
Case #: 8:20-cv-01502
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Real Property
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 02, 2020 4:52 AM EST
Defendant
Jane Does
Defendant
Investors Warranty of America, LLC
4333 Edgewood Road NE
Cedar Rapids, IA 52499
Represented By
Anthony Joseph LaPlaca
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Rebecca Allison Davis
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Edward Victor Arnold
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rock Springs Drive, LLC
1519 York Road
Lutherville, MD 21093
Represented By
Sara Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rock Spring Plaza II, LLC
Represented By
John Robinson
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Preston Smith
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
William M Bosch
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 03 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/3/2022. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Sep 22 2022
MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/22/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Dec 08 2022
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 184 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/8/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/8/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
GPO Mar 15 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/15/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Mar 28 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER directing that Plaintiff Rock Spring Plaza may file a response to IWA's brief no later than 4/14/2023; and that IWA may file a reply brief no later than 4/21/2023. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/28/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO May 30 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying as untimely 300 IWA's Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/30/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Jun 27 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER extending the discovery deadline in this case to 9/1/2023. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/27/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Nov 02 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/2/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Dec 05 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 383 Plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/4/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Feb 21 2024
MEMORANDUM to Counsel Scheduling a Telephone Conference on February 22, 2024 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/21/2024. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
GPO May 02 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 392 Plaza's Motion to Unseal Crime-Fraud Information; denying 400 Plaza's Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demand. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/1/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Jul 30 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying Defendant Rock Spring Drive, LLC's Request to Listen by Telephone to the Upcoming Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/30/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Aug 08 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/8/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Aug 09 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER APPROVING 509 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order subject to modifications. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/9/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
611 611 misc Transcript Mon 04/07 9:39 AM
Related: [-]
610 610 misc Transcript Mon 04/07 9:38 AM
Related: [-]
609 609 misc Transcript Mon 04/07 9:37 AM
Related: [-]
608 608 misc Transcript Mon 04/07 9:35 AM
Related: [-]
607 607 misc Transcript Mon 04/07 9:34 AM
Related: [-]
606 606 misc Transcript Mon 04/07 9:32 AM
Related: [-]
605 605 misc Transcript Mon 04/07 9:30 AM
Related: [-]