Morris et al v. Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Abbie Crites-Leoni |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00119 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 02, 2020 3:24 AM CST |
Defendant
Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC
CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Company 2214 Bolivar
Jefferson City, MO 65101 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buddy Finkbeiner
9402 Harper Lane
North Little Rock, AR 72118 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Larry McDaniel
505 West Washington Street
Kennett, MO 63857 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stan Morris
108 Southwest Dr.
Kennett, MO 63857 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stan Morris Construction, LLC
108 Southwest Dr.
Kennett, MO 63857 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all pending motions in this case are denied as moot and the instant cause of action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/18/20. (CMH) |
|
14 | 14
![]() First MOTION to Dismiss Case Filed by Plaintiffs Stan Morris, Stan Morris Construction, LLC. (Cornacchione, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Stan Morris, Stan Morris Construction, LLC.. (Cornacchione, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Steffens, John) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC, Buddy Finkbeiner. (Steffens, John) |
|
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC, Buddy Finkbeiner. (Steffens, John) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Electronic Notice of Noncompliance re: Disclosure of Organization Interests Certificate
Fri 06/26 3:45 PM
Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Plaintiff Stan Morris Construction, LLC. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/6/2020. (CMH) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate
Fri 06/26 2:55 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/6/2020. (CMH) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Larry McDaniel. (McFerron, Ross) |
|
6 | 6
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Larry McDaniel. (McFerron, Ross) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Ross D. McFerron for Defendant Larry McDaniel. (McFerron, Ross) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by John C. Steffens for Defendants Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC, Buddy Finkbeiner. (Steffens, John) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/11 1:43 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Bootheel Plaza Shopping Center, LLC, Buddy Finkbeiner, Larry McDaniel. The summons was emailed to Atty Cornacchinone. (MRS) |
||
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Mon 06/08 6:22 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate
Mon 06/08 10:09 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiffs Stan Morris, Stan Morris Construction, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 6/18/2020. (CMH) |
|
misc
Remark
Mon 06/08 9:15 AM
***REMARK to Plaintiff's counsel. The filing documents are required to be filed before case may proceed: Civil Cover Sheet, Original Filing Form, proposed summons, with Notice of Process Server, or waivers thereof. (CMH) Modified on 6/8/2020 (CMH) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 06/08 10:06 AM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CMH) |
||
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7950928, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Stan Morris, Stan Morris Construction, LLC.(Cornacchione, Daniel) |