New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Case #: 1:20-cv-04315
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e-2sx Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2020
Terminated:Jun 29, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 02, 2020 3:16 AM EST
Defendant
Sarah Hospelhorn
Defendant
Rob Sobers
Defendant
Varonis Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Courtney Patrice Fain
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Meredith Rosen Cavallaro
Paduano & Weintraub, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cindy Ng
Represented By
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon, Stoll, Bader And Nadler
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
39 39 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 06/29 4:23 PM
ORDER... A suggestion of settlement having been made, this case is dismissed. If the settlement is not consummated within 30 days of this order, or an authorized enlarged date, either party may apply by letter for restoration of the action within 10 days after the close of said period. All pending court dates are cancelled. The Clerk is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/29/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/28 11:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Settlement Conference held on 6/28/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 05/31 3:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference held on 5/31/2022 at 2:30 p.m. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 05/13 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's individual Settlement Conference Procedures. The parties are further instructed to submit their pre-conference submissions, along with their Attendance Acknowledgment Form (available in pdf fillable format as attachment to the Settlement Conference Procedures) no later than June 21, 2022, by 5:00 p.m.(rsh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/11 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 5/31/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices and Settlement Conference Procedures. The parties shall call the teleconference line at (888)-398-2342 and enter access code: 9543348.(rsh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/05 10:59 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/29 10:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 4/29/2022, ( Status Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
35 35 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/30 5:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference scheduled for April 28, 2022 is adjourned to April 29, 2022, at 10 a.m. The conference will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than April 26, 2022, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/30/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/30 5:11 PM
ORDER AMENDING CAPTION: It is hereby ordered that Clerk shall change the caption of the above-captioned matter to reflect the correct spelling of Defendant's name by changing the caption from "Ng v. Veronis Systems, Inc. et al." to "Ng v. Varonis Systems, Inc., et al.". SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/30/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 03/30 4:15 PM
ORDER denying25 Motion for Summary JudgmentPlaintiff is Cindy Ng, a former employee of Defendant Varonis Systems, a data security company headquartered in New York. Plaintiff alleges that Defendant discriminated against her on the basis of sex and race and that her termination was retaliation for filing a complaint. Specifically, she alleges that she was treated less well than three white, male coworkers because she is an Asian woman.While certain discrete acts of alleged discrimination that occurred before September 1, 2018 may be time-barred, the parties do not dispute that Plaintiffs placement on a personal improvement plan and termination were within the statute of limitations. Because there are triable issues of fact as to whether Plaintiff was similarly situated to certain coworkers and whether Defendants actions were pretextual, the motion for summary judgment as to all claims is denied.Counsel will meet with the court for a status conference, to set a trial date or chart additional proceedings, on April 28, 2022, at 10:00 a, (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein)(Text Only Order) (Hellerstein, Alvin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
32 32 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 09/20 8:18 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Varonis Systems, Inc...(Burns, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
31 31 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/09 7:04 PM
DECLARATION of Marshall B. Bellovin, Esq. in Opposition re:25 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34,
Att: 35 Exhibit 35,
Att: 36 Exhibit 36,
Att: 37 Exhibit 37,
Att: 38 Exhibit 38,
Att: 39 Exhibit 39,
Att: 40 Exhibit 40,
Att: 41 Exhibit 41
30 30 misc Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 Thu 09/09 6:55 PM
COUNTER STATEMENT TO28 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
29 29 29 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/09 6:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:25 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 07/09 12:59 PM
ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS, On July 9, 2021, I held a telephonic status conference in the above-captioned matter. As discussed at the conference, Defendants shall move for summary judgment by July 30, 2021, with opposition papers due by September 9, 2021, and reply papers due by September 20, 2021. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 7/30/2021., Responses due by 9/9/2021, Replies due by 9/20/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/9/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/09 10:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 7/9/2021, ( Motions due by 7/30/2021., Replies due by 9/20/2021., Responses due by 9/9/2021). (Jones, Brigitte)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/07 3:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for status conference on July 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., which will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than July 8, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. Telephone Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/7/2021) (nb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 06/28 2:56 PM
ORDER denying20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The request for an enlargement is denied. As described in defendant's opposition, plaintiff has had ample time to conduct discovery. The date fact discovery was to close was set at a conference held January 29, 2021. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/28/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 06/25 10:09 AM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Kerry A. Burns dated June 25, 2021 re:20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marshall B. Bellovin, Esq. dated June 24, 2021. . Document filed by Varonis Systems, Inc...(Burns, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - June 23, 2021 Email from K. Burns to M. Olowska,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - March 31, 2021 Email from S. Prager to K. Burns
Thursday, June 24, 2021
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 06/24 8:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marshall B. Bellovin, Esq. dated June 24, 2021. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/21 9:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Monika Karolina Olowska on behalf of Cindy Ng..(Olowska, Monika)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
18 18 order Protective Order Wed 04/28 12:06 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/28/2021) (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
17 17 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Mon 04/26 6:27 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/03 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerry Ann Burns on behalf of Varonis Systems, Inc...(Burns, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
15 15 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Thu 02/04 8:50 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Varonis Systems, Inc...(Fain, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/29 10:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/29/2021, ( Status Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
14 14 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Wed 01/27 5:22 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Prager, Sholom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 01/14 3:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for an initial pre-trial conference on January 29, 2021 at 10:00a.m., which conference will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749; Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than January 20, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/14/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/22 1:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Varonis Systems, Inc...(Fain, Courtney)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/22 1:36 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Varonis Systems, Inc...(Fain, Courtney)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/22 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Patrice Fain on behalf of Varonis Systems, Inc...(Fain, Courtney)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/22 1:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meredith Rosen Cavallaro on behalf of Varonis Systems, Inc...(Cavallaro, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 06/25 3:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Varonis Systems, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 06/25 3:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarah Hospelhorn..(jgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 06/25 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rob Sobers..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/24 8:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rob Sobers, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/24 8:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sarah Hospelhorn, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/24 8:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Varonis Systems, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 06/08 9:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 06/08 9:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 06/08 9:38 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 06/08 9:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Benjamin Bellovin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $6,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet. (pne)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/05 5:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/05 5:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Sarah Hospelhorn, Rob Sobers, Veronis Systems, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20132543)Document filed by Cindy Ng..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Notice of Right to Sue