King et al v. Habib Bank Limited
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Referred: | Ona T Wang |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-04322 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 02, 2020 4:01 AM EST |
Defendant
Habib Bank Limited
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Abreu-Border
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Aleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Marie Anzures
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B.C.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Misty Marie Barclay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Bennedsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Bennedsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brianna N. Benson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick C. Benson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Elm Boatwright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Harriman Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natasha Buchanan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Michael Burley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emmitt Dwayne Burns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
August Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corbin Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Matias Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gillian Leigh Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrey Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Elm Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Marie Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Caruso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Chisholm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karma Chisholm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Cleary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Cleary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Gregory Clyburn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Johanna Coates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Denise Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Aaron Crow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Novak Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel C. Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Sara Darrough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Charles Darrough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick Anthony Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelli Dodge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Dotson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E.N.R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Edward Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Ann Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Raymond Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis John Elm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Lee Elm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Elm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louella E. Frison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garrett Layne Funk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G.A.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charmaine Renee Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Goins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Edward Goins , III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erin Nicole Goss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ann L. Gould
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James A. Gould
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Patrick Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
H.R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Hager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Hardison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justina Hardison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Hardison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Michelle Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felicia Ann Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sorainya Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tennyson Charles Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Henigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Hock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trecia Brock Hood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Paul Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Matthew Jayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Elmer Jayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Wayne Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K.K.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Kahler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barclay Kamaleson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cade Kamaleson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cedric Paul Kamaleson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Kamaleson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abby Knapp-Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Korona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L.A.E.L.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Lambka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Lambka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas A. Landphair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jean S. Landphair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meredith Landphair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. Richard Looney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Looney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.G.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin E. Madden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin P. Madden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela J. Madden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsey R. Maldonado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karyn Stone Marta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Marta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Marta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Renae Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Martinusen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ranee Massoni
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Cheyenne Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Renee Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Pierce Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonja McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen McEvoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Rose McEvoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Charles McEvoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon K. McNulty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marie Sentina Mielke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Ann Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Mills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Lee Mittler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cristine Mittler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Mittler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Negron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Negron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maribel Negron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Negron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Edward Newman, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Novak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Olmstead
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Olmstead
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christa L. Osborn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Creighton David Osborn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kade M. Osborn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katlyn M. Osborn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P.A.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felicia Gross Paniagua
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Socorro Gross Paniagua
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David L. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Plunk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin T. Plunk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Powers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Priolo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice H. Proctor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JD Prosser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R.G.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R.X.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Rainey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Rangel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blaine A. Redding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather L. Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cassie Marie Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Ristaino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Ristau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Ristau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jannett Cecilia Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alyson Overman Rodgers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel R. Roldan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lieselotte R. Roldan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthias P. Roldan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha G. Roldan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Carolina Rotelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rufus, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Rufus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S.L.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S.L.L.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Tyler Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leeann Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip J. Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Shedd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Georganne M. Siercks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kent Alan Skeens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry A. Skeens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan M. Smedinghoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark T. Smedinghoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Beth Smedinghoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina C. Smedinghoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Smedinghoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Carolina Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrian Carrillo Soltero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Soltero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erik Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garry Lee Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Douglas Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annette Spehar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Louis Spehar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke Spehar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Spehar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell L. Stambaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bob Surprenant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristie Surprenant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Freddie Dewey Sutton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harriet Sutton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Summer Breanne Sutton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julianna Symkowiak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T.L.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evelyn Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Timoney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Timoney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Gregory Timoney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marta Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Diane Trelfa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joyce L. Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luann Varney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Welch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorria Welch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zackary Welch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colleen Whipple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Whipple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberley A. Whipple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Whipple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Elmer Wickliff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenda Willard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Williams, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Shervon Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Talisa Shervon Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Z.R.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Baily Zimmerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Lee Zimmerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Zimmerman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
405 | 405
![]() LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Claire A. DeLelle dated (previously filed in camera on August 8, 2024) re: Briefing on Privilege Log Disputes286 . Document filed by Habib Bank Limited..(DeLelle, Claire) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
404 | 404
![]() LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Danielle Nicholson dated April 22, 2025 re: Letter Brief re Privilege Disputes. Document filed by Kathleen McEvoy, A.J.J., A.L.S., A.M.S., A.R.S., A.T., A.T.P., Holly Abraham, Katherine Abreu-Border, Charles Adkins, Velvet Adkins, Jose Aleman, Kathleen Alexander, Vanessa Anzures, Judith Ashley, Suzanna Ausborn, B.C.D., Christopher Baldridge, Christopher Baptist, Misty Barclay, April Bays, Brenda Bays, Jasmin Bays, Timothy Bays, Scott Bennedsen, Tracy Bennedsen, Frederick Benson, Maggie Bilyeu, Catherine Boatwright, Mary Border, Tammy Bowden, Ernest Brown, Marissa Brown, Janice Bryant, Natasha Buchanan, William Burley, William Burley, Emmitt Burns, C.C.V., C.E.S., C.F., August Cabrera, Corbin Cabrera, Daniel Cabrera, Gillian Cabrera, Robert Cabrera, Arthur Campbell, Audrey Campbell, Cynthia Campbell, Margaret Campbell, Tina Campbell, Janice Caruso, Glenn Chisholm, Karma Chisholm, April Cleary, Jonathan Cleary, Brian Clyburn, Jamie Coates, Michael Collins, Louise Conlon, David Crow, Carlos Cruz, Jessica Cruz, Joel Cruz, D.M., Diane Danyluk, Judith Darrough, Robert Darrough, Alberto Diaz, Anthony Diaz, Conchetta Diaz, Frances Diaz, Kayla Diaz, Matthew Diaz, Maximo Diaz, Kelli Dodge, Kelli-Jo Dodge, Letha Dodge, Ronnie Dodge, Tiffany Dotson, Phouthasith Douangdara, Summer Dunn, Carey Duval, E.B., E.N.R., Brian Ellis, Julie Ellis, Victor Ellis, Dennis Elm, Donna Elm, Matthew Elm, Stephanie Fisher, Thomas Fogarty, Louella Frison, Garrett Funk, G.A.S., G.S., G.W.P., Charlette Gilbert, Charmaine Gilbert, Jordan Gilbert, Patricia Goins, Paul Goins, Kirk Gollnitz, Tyler Gollnitz, Sheila Good, Cedric Gordon, Cedric Gordon, Erin Goss, Ann Gould, Ann Gould, Carol Griffin, Daniel Griffin, Matt Griffin, Shawn Griffin, Craig Gross, Natalie Gross, H.R., Stephanie Hager, Karim Hakimyar, Mary Hammerbacher-Nichols, Jerry Hardison, Justina Hardison, Ashley Harris, Brittany Harris, Felicia Harris, Sorainya Harris, Tennyson Harris, Alex Henigan, Michelle Hock, Meghan Hollingsworth, Trecia Hood, Daniel Hughes, Daniel Hughes, Patricia Hughes, Michael Iubelt, Shelby Iubelt, J.A.L., Dominic Jacobs, Jim Jacobs, Jim Jacobs, Laguanda Jacobs, Adam Jayne, Paul Jayne, Christopher Johnson, K.E.F.V., K.F., K.K., K.L., K.M.G.V., K.N.V., Angela Kahler, Barclay Kamaleson, Cade Kamaleson, Cedric Kamaleson, Nicole Kamaleson, Sunderraj Kamaleson, Zara Karim, Kevin King, Abby Knapp-Morris, Susan Kolean, Brandon Korona, Catherine Kryzda, L.A.E.L.B., L.B., L.R.P., L.S., L.T., Brian Lambka, Jordan Lambka, Douglas Landphair, Jean Landphair, Meredith Landphair, Connor Larson, Alexander Lau, David Lau, Hamide Lau, Leroy Lau Jr., Martha Looney, Charlotte Loquasto, M.G.C., M.G.N., M.L., M.M., Martin Madden, Martin Madden, Pamela Madden, Lindsey Maldonado, Mitchell Maloy, Summer Maloy, Karyn Marta, Lawrence Marta, Taylor Marta, Catherine Martin, Elizabeth Martin, Julie Martin, Suzanne Martinez, Lisa Martinusen, Hannah Mason, Ranee Massoni, Cody Mays, Tammy Mays, Thomas Mays, Annie McBride, Chester McBride, John McCarthy, Alexandra McClintock, George McClintock, III, Sonja McDaniel, Kathleen McEvoy, Michelle McEvoy, Patrick McEvoy, Shannon McNulty, MaryJane Medeiros, Marie Mielke, Stephanie Miller, Beverly Mills, Alexander Mittler, Cristine Mittler, Terry Mittler, Linda Mundale, N.D., N.J.A.D., Gabriel Negron, Jose Negron, Maribel Negron, Marvin Negron, William Nevins, Amanda Newman, Donald Newman, William Newnham, Brandon Nichols, Bruce Nichols, Cynthia Nichols, Douglas Nichols, Jeanne Nichols, Monte Nichols, Anngel Norkist, Aujza Norkist, Hart Norkist, Susan Novak, Dan Olmstead, Tammy Olmstead, P.A.D., Carlos Paniagua, Felicia Paniagua, Socorro Paniagua, David Parker, Joyce Paulsen, Delaynie Peek, Julianne Perry, Kathleen Perry, Stewart Perry, Vivian Perry, Sarah Peterson, Ida Pittman, John Pittman Sr., Jordan Plunk, Justin Plunk, Alison Pohn, Jurley Pomeroy-Torian, Christopher Powers, Thomas Priolo, Janice Proctor, JD Prosser, Brian Provost, Gail Provost, Gertrude Provost, John Provost, Louis Provost, Paul Provost, Scott Provost, Spencer Provost, R.C.V., R.G., R.X.C., Dana Rainey, Christine Rangel, Michelle Rauschenberger, Blaine Redding, Lindsay Redoutey, David Reed, Heather Reed, Charlotte Reeves, Victoria Reeves, Linda Reynolds, Cassie Richardson, Michelle Riley, Rodney Riley, Nathan Rimpf, Carlos Rios, Sheila Ristaino, Randy Ristau, Suzanne Ristau, Jannett Roberts, Daniel Robinson, Nicole Robles, Alyson Rodgers, Leslie Rodriguez, Barbara Roland, Erica Roland, Mark Roland, Angel Roldan, Lieselotte Roldan, Matthias Roldan, Samantha Roldan, Christopher Rosebrock, Michelle Rotelli, Alex Rozanski, Michael Rufus, Stephanie Rufus, S.B., S.K., S.L.B., S.L.L.B., S.M.P., Brandon Schmidt, Leeann Schmidt, Natalie Schmidt, Phillip Schmidt, Christopher Schoonhoven, Deborah Schoonhoven, Tammie Schoonhoven, Sarah Schwallie, Wendy Shedd, Adrian Sherrod, Georganne Siercks, Kent Skeens, Sherry Skeens, Joan Smedinghoff, Mark Smedinghoff, Mary Smedinghoff, Regina Smedinghoff, Thomas Smedinghoff, Esta Smith, Jammie Smith, Adrian Soltero, Gustavo Soltero, Maria Soltero, Erik Sparks, Garry Sparks, Jan Sparks, Jane Sparks, Zachary Sparks, Annette Spehar, Jacob Spehar, Luke Spehar, Patrick Spehar, Mitchell Stambaugh, Julia Steiner, Mia Steiner, Charles Strange, Katelyn Strange, Charles Strange III, Bob Surprenant, Kristie Surprenant, Freddie Sutton, Harriet Sutton, Summer Sutton, Summer Sutton, Julianna Symkowiak, T.L.S., Ariell Taylor, Evelyn Taylor, Jasmine Thomas, Rachel Thompson, Diane Timoney, Gregory Timoney, Ryan Timoney, Elijah Torian, Emily Torian, Joe Torian, Nathan Torian, Marta Torres, Hollie Towle, Gloria Trelfa, Joyce Tulloch, Joyce Turner, Samantha Ulrich, V.I., Luann Varney, Gladys Vereen, Hortense Vickers, Mark Vickers, Mary Vickers, Robert Vickers Jr., Robert Vickers Sr., Barry Welch, Lorria Welch, Zackary Welch, Colleen Whipple, David Whipple, Kimberley Whipple, Sean Whipple, Jeffrey White, Kyle White, Michael White, Paula White, Thomas Wickliff, Glenda Willard, Clarence Williams, Mallory Williams, Samantha Williams, Talisa Williams, Abrill Williams-Osbourne, Makahea Xhelili, Michelle Yarborough, Z.R.S., Baily Zimmerman, Chris Zimmerman, Michelle Zimmerman, Kristine Zitny..(Nicholson, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
403 | 403
![]() ORDER: The Court is in receipt of ECF 402. The parties' request to extend the fact discovery deadline is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is hereby EXTENDED to May 16, 2025. The parties are directed to file a joint status letter by May 16, 2025, apprising the Court on the status of discovery. The parties are further directed to file on the docket their letter briefs regarding the privilege-log dispute, and may redact or seal their filings as proposed in ECF 402. ( Fact Discovery due by 5/16/2025.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/21/2025) (rro) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
402 | 402
![]() JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Claire A. DeLelle dated April 18, 2025 re: Joint Status Letter Regarding Discovery. Document filed by Habib Bank Limited..(DeLelle, Claire) |