New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Roanne L Mann
Case #: 1:20-cv-02554
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2020
Terminated:Jul 11, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2020 5:33 AM EST
Defendant
City University of New York
Represented By
Johane Severin
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Alissa Schecter Wright
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
New York City College of Technology
Represented By
Johane Severin
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Alissa Schecter Wright
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Micheal Timmer
Represented By
Robert Philip Valletti
Valletti & Associates, LLC
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2021
ion Act discrimination claim, Rehabilitation Act retaliation claim, and hostile work environment claim will all proceed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/13/2021. (Sharon, William)ORDER: For the reasons in the the attached Memorandum & Order, Defendant's 17 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Title VII discrimination claim is dismissed. His Title VII retaliation claim, Rehabilitat

Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Monday, July 11, 2022
46 46 25 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/11 3:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties'45 Settlement Agreement is So Ordered. This case is now closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/11/2022. (Kim, Eliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
45 45 misc Settlement Agreement Fri 07/08 12:01 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT to be So-Ordered by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
44 44 misc Transcript Wed 06/29 7:45 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 10, 2022, before Judge Mann. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc.. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 7/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2022. (Hong, Loan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
43 43 motion Stay Tue 06/14 2:14 PM
First MOTION to Stay deadline to complete document production by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 06/14 3:41 PM
ORDER Application granted, on consent.43 Motion to Stay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/14/2022. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
42 42 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 06/10 6:08 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/10/2022. The Court conducts a telephonic hearing during which the parties are advised that both sides have accepted the Court's settlement proposal; the Court reviews the settlement terms with the parties, and pro se plaintiff and defense counsel each acknowledge on the record that these are the terms they agreed to and that they now have a binding settlement agreement. The stipulation of discontinuance is due by July 11, 2022. See attached. (Ertzbischoff, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
41 41 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/06 6:36 PM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/6/2022. The Court conducts a telephonic settlement conference. Settlement discussions were held. Each party is directed to respond to the Court's settlement recommendation, via email, by 11:00 a.m. on Monday, June 13, 2022. See attached. (Ertzbischoff, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 05/27 11:15 AM
ORDER40 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application granted in substantial part, on consent. The Shaneatta Henry deposition will go forward on June 3, 2022 . Defendants must complete their document production by June 15, 2022 , with documents material to settlement discussions to be produced by June 2, 2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/27/2022. (LK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
40 40 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 05/26 6:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 05/02 12:36 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion for Protective Order. The Court approves the parties' Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order (DE #39-1), with the following clarifications: Section 8 (first and second sentences) and Section 27 (third sentence): Where the document refers to "counsel for the Party," "counsel for the Designating Party," or "counsel for the Receiving Party," the word "counsel" shall be construed to apply also to a Party proceeding pro se . Section 10: When a submission is filed under seal, the filing party shall simultaneously publicly file a copy of such submission that has been redacted to remove portions containing or reflecting the contents of materials designated as Confidential. Section 27: This provision does not apply to the Court's copies of documents containing or reflecting the contents of materials designated as Confidential. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/2/2022. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
39 39 motion Protective Order Fri 04/29 11:26 AM
First MOTION for Protective Order by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 28, 2022
order Order on Motion for Hearing Thu 04/28 9:38 AM
ORDER38 Motion for Hearing. Application granted. A settlement conference will be held on June 6, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. ; as the date approaches, the Court's staff will provide logistical information, including whether the hearing will be held remotely or in person. The Court sua sponte adjourns the June 13th deadline for requesting a premotion conference until June 20, 2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/28/2022. (LK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
38 38 motion Hearing Wed 04/27 1:23 PM
Letter MOTION for Hearing by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
order Order(Other) Mon 04/18 4:24 PM
ORDER At the initial conference held on September 30, 2021, this Court gave the parties until March 4, 2022 to complete fact discovery, with requests for a premotion conference due by March 16, 2022 (DE #29). Thereafter, on February 3, 2022, plaintiff's counsel moved to withdraw (DE #33) and, following a hearing with plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel on March 8, 2022, this Court granted the motion to withdraw, stayed discovery until April 7, 2022, and gave plaintiff until that date to retain new counsel (DE #36). As that deadline has passed without the filing of a notice of appearance on plaintiff's behalf, plaintiff is now proceeding pro se (without counsel). Given the period of time that has elapsed since the filing of the motion to withdraw, the Court reopens and extends discovery, which is no longer stayed, until May 31, 2022 ; requests for a premotion conference are now due by June 13, 2022 . Plaintiff and defense counsel are directed to confer and, by April 28, 2022 , defense counsel shall file a joint letter-motion proposing either the rescheduling of a settlement conference or referral of the case to court-annexed mediation, for participation in the Mediation Advocacy Program (for cases involving pro se litigants). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/18/2022. (LK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
utility Email Test Wed 03/09 7:19 AM
Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
37 37 minutes Telephone Conference Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/08 4:20 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/8/2022 and Order granting33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Shortly before 3:00 p.m., nearly an hour after the scheduled start time for the ex parte hearing on plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw, plaintiff Timmer dialed in to the conference line and the Court was able to proceed with the sealed hearing, with plaintiff and his counsel. Although Mr. Timmer objects to the motion to withdraw, his statements to the Court confirm that there has been an irreversible breakdown in the attorney/client relationship. Therefore, and with the movant's assurance that his firm will not be asserting a charging or retaining lien, the Court grants the motion to withdraw (DE #33), and gives plaintiff until April 7, 2022 , to secure new counsel and have that counsel file a notice of appearance. In the event no notice of appearance is filed by that date, plaintiff will be deemed to be proceeding pro se , and is encouraged to contact the Federal Pro Se Legal Assistance Clinic, whose flyer is attached to a copy of this Order. The Order to Show Cause portion of the Minute Entry docketed earlier today is vacated. The Clerk is requested to update the docket to terminate Mr. Valletti's appearance and to add Mr. Timmer's contact information. The case is stayed until April 7, 2022 . See attached. (Ertzbischoff, Natasha)
Related: [-]
36 36 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/08 3:10 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/8/2022. The Court conducts a sealed, ex parte hearing on plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw based on an irreconcilable conflict between counsel and plaintiff Timmer. Despite having been served with a copy of the Court's Order of February 28, 2022, which set up this hearing for 2:00 p.m. today and required plaintiff to dial in, and despite plaintiff's counsel's voicemail message to plaintiff this afternoon reminding him of the proceeding, and an email sent by the Court's staff, plaintiff violated the Court's order by failing to participate. Plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw thus stands unopposed. Plaintiff is admonished for flouting the Court's directive and is ordered, on pain of sanctions, to show cause, in writing, by March 14, 2022, why the Valletti firm's motion to withdraw should not be granted; if plaintiff consents to the motion, he must nevertheless so advise the Court, in writing, by that same deadline, i.e., March 14, 2022. Plaintiff is warned that if he fails to timely comply with today's order, this Court will grant the motion to withdraw and may sanction him and recommend that the case be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is requested to mail a copy of this order to plaintiff's home address and to email him a copy, at the addresses reflected on DE #35-11. See attached (Ertzbischoff, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
34 34 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 02/28 2:08 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/28 8:41 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to electronically file under seal (with access restricted to court users), and to serve on plaintiff, a description of the "irreconcilable conflict" referenced in counsel's application to withdraw. An ex parte telephonic hearing on the motion to withdraw will be held on March 8, 2022 at 2:00 p.m.; plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel must participate. The movant is directed to serve a copy of this order on his client, to provide his client with dial-in information (to be furnished by the Court's staff) and to file proof of service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/28/2022. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 02/28 8:44 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion to Adjourn Conference. In light of plaintiff's counsel's pending motion to withdraw, the March 8th settlement conference is adjourned sine die . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/28/2022. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
33 33 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/03 11:11 AM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 01/10 4:42 PM
Terminate 1/13/2022 adjourned court date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/10/2022.(LK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
32 32 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 01/05 4:03 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 01/05 5:03 PM
ORDER32 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The previously adjourned settlement conference will be held on March 8, 2022 at 2:15 p.m. As the date approaches, the parties will be informed whether the proceeding will be held in person or remotely. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/5/2022. (LK)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Mon 12/27 4:41 PM
ORDER31 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. Having consulted with District Judge Chen, this Court denies plaintiff's application to further amend his pleading to add state and local claims (which are currently pending in state court) and individual defendants. Plaintiff has not shown good cause to add new claims and parties in a case that has been pending for more than 18 months and in which the parties have already engaged in dispositive motion practice. In the course of a premotion conference that was conducted before Judge Chen in November 2020, plaintiff was afforded the opportunity to amend his complaint and he did so, and the resulting Amended Complaint led to a defense motion to dismiss that was thereafter granted in part. Plaintiff provides no explanation as to why he could not, with due diligence, have asserted the proposed state and local claims and added individual defendants in his Amended Complaint, or why he waited nearly a year after filing his Amended Complaint before seeking permission to file a Second Amended Complaint. Moreover, the proposed amendments may well delay the resolution of the currently pending federal claims, as the parties have also requested that the defendants be afforded 45 days to respond to the new pleading, including by "submit[ting] a pre-motion to dismiss letter" (DE #31 at 1) - presumably relating to the newly added state and local claims. In other words, the parties contemplate that the District Court, having disposed of a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint, might be asked to address a second round of motions, concerning claims that to be asserted under the Court's supplemental jurisdiction. For the foregoing reasons, the Court denies plaintiff's belated request to file a Second Amended Complaint. The parties are encouraged to confer in an effort to avoid duplicative discovery in the two parallel actions. As for the parties' request to adjourn the January 13th settlement conference, that proceeding is adjourned sine die ; the parties shall, by January 5, 2022 , file a joint letter-motion stating when the parties believe that they will have sufficient evidence to proceed with a settlement conference and advising the Court of counsel's and the parties' unavailability during that time period. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/27/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
31 31 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Thu 12/23 3:23 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
order Order on Motion for Hearing Wed 10/06 9:23 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Hearing. A settlement conference will be held on January 13, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. ; clients must participate. As the date approaches, counsel will be provided with logistical details, including whether the proceeding will be held in person or remotely. By January 11, 2022 , counsel shall email to chambers and opposing counsel copies of previously exchanged documents that are critical to settlement discussions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/6/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
30 30 motion Hearing Tue 10/05 4:26 PM
MOTION for Hearing by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
29 29 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 09/30 11:27 AM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. The Court conducts a telephonic initial conference. By October 6, 2021, the parties must file a joint letter-motion requesting that the discovery schedule be held in abeyance (in the event the parties have agreed to settle the case) or requesting a settlement conference or a referral to court-annexed mediation, as well as indicating the parties' availability to commence settlement discussions. The deadline for the parties to amend their pleadings as of right is deemed to have expired; any application for further amendment must be made on a showing of good cause. The Court defers setting a schedule for expert disclosures, given the parties' indication that any expert employed would relate to damages. Fact discovery must be completed by March 4, 2022. The parties have until March 16, 2022, to request a premotion conference before Judge Chen. See attached. (Ertzbischoff, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 09/29 10:38 AM
ORDER Application granted, on consent. Motion for Protective Order. [DE #28-1] is so-ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/29/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
28 28 motion Protective Order Tue 09/28 7:42 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 09/28 7:27 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Case Management Questionnaire
Friday, September 17, 2021
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 09/17 4:32 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/09 12:07 PM
ORDER terminating25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re25 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference - Terminated per 8/18/21 order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/9/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 08/18 10:44 AM
ORDER Application granted, on consent.25 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendants' answer is due by September 17, 2021 . The September 9th initial conference is adjourned to September 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/18/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
25 25 motion Adjourn Conference Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/17 3:02 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference , First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
24 24 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/16 12:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on September 9, 2021 @ 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on September 7, 2021 . *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833. If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/16/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
23 23 34 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 08/13 5:33 PM
ORDER: For the reasons in the the attached Memorandum & Order, Defendant's17 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Title VII discrimination claim is dismissed. His Title VII retaliation claim, Rehabilitation Act discrimination claim, Rehabilitation Act retaliation claim, and hostile work environment claim will all proceed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/13/2021. (Sharon, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/07 5:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/17 2:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 03/09 3:59 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Additional Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 03/09 11:02 PM
ORDER: The20 motion for an extension is granted. Defendant shall file its supplemental letter by March 17, 2021, and Plaintiff shall file his supplemental letter by April 7, 2021. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/9/2021. (Larson, Emma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
order Scheduling Order Thu 02/18 5:20 PM
ORDER: The Court construes Defendant's17 pre-motion conference request as a motion to dismiss, and will permit the following additional briefing: Defendant may file an additional letter, of not more than six pages, on or before March 10, 2021, and Plaintiff may file a response, also of not more than six pages, on or before March 31, 2021. A pre-motion conference is unnecessary at this time. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/18/2021. (Larson, Emma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/17 3:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/02 12:11 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's18 motion for an extension of time to file is granted. Plaintiff may file his response to the17 pre-motion conference request on or before February 17, 2021. The Court offers its condolences to Plaintiff's counsel. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/2/2021. (Larson, Emma)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/01 10:33 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
17 17 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 01/27 4:41 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/30 2:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City University of New York, New York City College of Technology, filed by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
minutes Pre Motion Conference Tue 11/17 12:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pamela K. Chen: Pre Motion Conference held on 11/17/2020, via telephone. Appearances by Robert Valletti for Plaintiff; Johane Severin for Defendants. Case Called. Discussion held. Plaintiff agreed to dismiss his ADA, NYSHRL, and NYCHRL claims as barred by sovereign immunity. The Court granted Plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint, and set January 1, 2021, as the deadline for that amended complaint. Defendants will respond to the Amended Complaint on or before January 29, 2021. (Court Reporter Denise Parisi.) (Larson, Emma)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 10/26 11:04 AM
ORDER: Defendants'14 motion for a pre-motion conference is granted. The Court will hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on Tuesday, November 17, 2020, at 11 am. At that time, the parties shall call 1-888-684-8852, and use access code 7245547, to participate in the conference. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/26/2020. (Larson, Emma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
15 15 misc Letter Wed 10/07 3:51 PM
Letter in Response to Pre-Motion Letter by Micheal Timmer (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
14 14 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 10/01 5:16 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/24 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Johane Severin on behalf of City University of New York, New York City College of Technology (aty to be noticed) (Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/30 8:03 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint by City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Wright, Alissa)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 07/30 2:22 PM
ORDER granting, on consent12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, City University of New York answer due October 2, 2020 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/30/2020. (LK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/22 11:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheal Timmer. City University of New York served on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 07/22 11:35 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Micheal Timmer as to New York City College of Technology. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/22 11:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheal Timmer. New York City College of Technology served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/22 11:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheal Timmer. City University of New York served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 06/10 8:24 AM
Summons Issued as to City University of New York, New York City College of Technology. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 06/10 8:18 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 06/10 8:18 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/10 8:17 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/08 8:29 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Micheal Timmer (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/08 8:28 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Micheal Timmer (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/08 8:27 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Micheal Timmer (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/08 8:23 PM
COMPLAINT against City University of New York, New York City College of Technology filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12898876 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Micheal Timmer. (Valletti, Robert)
Related: [-]