Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:W Louis Sands
Case #: 1:12-cv-00076
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 22, 2012
Terminated:Oct 29, 2013
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2016 8:39 PM EST
Cross Claimant
SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION
Represented By
WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III
contact info
Cross Defendant
MICHAEL MOCK
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
KEVIN PLESS
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
MICHAEL ANTHONY LEWIS
Member of the Sumter County Board of Education, in his official capacity 521 WILDWOOD CIRCLE
AMERICUS, GA 31709
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
MEDA KRENSON
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
EDITH GREEN
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
ALICE GREEN
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
WILLA FITZPATRICK
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
Sumter County School District
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
Carolyn Whitehead
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Cross Defendant
MICHAEL BUSMAN
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL ANTHONY LEWIS
Member of the Sumter County Board of Education, in his official capacity 521 WILDWOOD CIRCLE
AMERICUS, GA 31709
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION
Represented By
WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III
contact info
Defendant
SHERRY RATLIFF
Represented By
WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III
contact info
Defendant
Sumter County School District
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
KEVIN PLESS
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
Carolyn Whitehead
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL MOCK
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
MEDA KRENSON
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
EDITH GREEN
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
ALICE GREEN
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
WILLA FITZPATRICK
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL BUSMAN
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
SYBIL PATERSON
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Cynthia Johnson
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
VALARIE GRIMES
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
SUMTER COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Eugene Edge, Jr
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
MICHAEL D COLEY
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
ROBIN PLAIR WILEY
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
MATHIS K WRIGHT, JR
Represented By
LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
contact info
NANCY G ABUDU
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM BIRD
Represented By
WILLIAM W CALHOUN
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Defendant
Sumter County Board of Education
Terminated: 08/27/2012
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info
Defendant
Sumter County Board of Education
Terminated: 08/27/2012
Represented By
MAURICE L KING, Jr.
contact info
Randall C. Farmer
Brock, Clay, Calhoun & Rogers, P.C.
contact info
David Arthur Siegel
contact info

GPO Oct 28 2013
ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice. The preliminary in junction ordered by the Court on 6/21/2012 is lifted. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W. Louis Sands on 10/28/2013. (bcl)
GPO Apr 03 2014
ORDER for Plaintiff to submit evidence regarding the reasonableness of his requested attorney's fees within 14 days of entry of this Order. Defendant may file a response to such evidence, if filed, within 14 days of Plaintiff's submission of said evidence. Failure to submit the proper evidence may result in the denial of Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 4/3/14. (wks)
GPO May 27 2014
ORDER granting 84 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant shall remit to Plaintiff within 30 days of the entry of this order $29,400.00 in attorney's fees and $1,184.74 in costs for a total of $30,584.74. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 5/27/2014. (bcl)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.