Brenda Dickson v. Century Park East Homeowners Association et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-05152 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 07, 2020 3:10 AM PST |
Cross Claimant
Century Park East Homeowners Association
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Brian Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Swedelson and Gottlieb
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Century Park East Homeowners Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Swedelson and Gottlieb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Dickson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 09/09/2020
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |