Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:20-cv-11112
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2020
Terminated:Mar 08, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 08, 2020 3:46 AM EST
Counter Claimant
The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By
Alexander G. Henlin
Sulloway & Hollis, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Acadia Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael F. Aylward
Morrison Mahoney LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By
Alexander G. Henlin
Sulloway & Hollis, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Acadia Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael F. Aylward
Morrison Mahoney LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Martins Construction Company, INC.,
Terminated: 07/10/2020
Defendant
The Academy at Penguin Hall, Inc.
Terminated: 07/10/2020


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 05, 2021
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/05 10:22 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Acadia Insurance Company. (McDonough, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
22 22 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Mon 03/08 9:22 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 03/05 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Acadia Insurance Company (McDonough, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/12 1:54 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Litigation Deadlines. All fact discovery to be completed by April 25, 2021. Dispositive motions by May 19, 2021, with Oppositions by June 9, 2021; Reply, if any, by leave of court. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
19 19 motion Extension of Time Mon 01/11 1:44 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Litigation Deadlines by Acadia Insurance Company.(McDonough, Brian)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Mon 01/11 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brian P. McDonough (for Attorney Aylward) (McDonough, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/07 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. McDonough on behalf of Acadia Insurance Company (McDonough, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/09 11:22 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acadia Insurance Company. (Aylward, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Disclosure Mon 11/09 9:25 AM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Acadia Insurance Company.(Aylward, Michael) Modified docket text on 11/9/2020 (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 11/09 9:22 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Acadia Insurance Company.(Aylward, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 10/09 11:30 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with certificate of service , COUNTERCLAIM against Acadia Insurance Company by The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast.(Henlin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Tender Letter to Acadia,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Acadia's Responses to Tender Letter
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/09 11:23 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast.. (Henlin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
11 11 order Order Wed 09/30 9:51 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. A Waiver of Service returned executed by defendant The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, with an Answer due 10/9/20, the court enters the following pretrial schedule: Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 10/22/20; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties must be filed by 12/18/20. Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the 30 days of the initial disclosures. The court expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 4 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 2/22/21 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 3/26/21. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/19/21, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 5/10/21; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 1/15/21, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
10 10 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/29 9:35 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss (Voluntary) and September 25, 2020 "Show Cause" Order filed by Acadia Insurance Company. (Aylward, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/28 12:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Henlin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/28 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander G. Henlin on behalf of The Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast (Henlin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
7 7 order Order Fri 09/25 11:39 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), the court directs plaintiff Acadia Insurance Company to show cause by October 5, 2020, why this case should not be dismissed against defendant Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast for Acadia's failure to make service within the circumscribed 90 days. SO ORDERED. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Thu 08/06 11:02 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re1 Complaint, by Acadia Insurance Company. (Aylward, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
5 5 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 07/10 5:17 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion to Dismiss defendants Martins Construction and the Academy at Penguin Hall without prejudice. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
4 4 motion Dismiss Mon 07/06 9:53 AM
MOTION to Dismiss (Voluntary) by Acadia Insurance Company.(Aylward, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/11 11:07 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Weyland, Loren)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 06/11 10:32 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/11 9:12 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8279852 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Acadia Insurance Company.(Aylward, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet