Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Mary S Mcelroy
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:20-cv-00257
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2020
Terminated:Jun 22, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 09, 2020 5:22 AM EST
Defendant
Capital Grille Holdings
Represented By
Michael J. Marcello
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
GMRI, Inc.
Plaintiff
Meaghan Oliveira
Represented By
Amato A. DeLuca
Deluca & Associates, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Thursday, June 22, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation Thu 06/22 10:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Capital Grille Holdings. (Marcello, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order Entering Stipulation Thu 06/22 12:53 PM
TEXT Order Entering16 STIPULATION of Dismissal . So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/22/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
15 15 misc Status Report Thu 02/16 4:31 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Meaghan Oliveira. (DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
order Order Fri 01/27 7:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are hereby directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before 2/17/2023. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/27/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
14 14 misc Status Report Thu 09/08 10:25 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Meaghan Oliveira. (DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
order Order Fri 07/08 8:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are hereby directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before 9/8/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/8/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 03/15 3:21 PM
STATUS REPORT by Capital Grille Holdings. (Marcello, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
order Order Tue 02/01 2:36 PM
TEXT ORDER : The parties are hereby directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before March 15, 2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/1/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
minutes Motion Hearing Mon 09/27 2:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: Motion Hearing held on 9/27/2021 re8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings pending completion of Arbitration: M. Provencher, M. Marcello, K. Revens. Arguments heard. For reasons stated on the record, the Court grants motion in part and denies in part. Court denies Motion to Dismiss. Court grants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case. Recess. (Court Reporter D. Veitch in Courtroom Remote Hearing at 2:00 pm.) (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 09/27 2:34 PM
ORALORDER: For reasons stated on the record, the Court grants motion in part and denies in part8 Motion to Dismiss. Court denies Motion to Dismiss. Court grants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 9/27/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Mon 09/27 2:34 PM
Case Stayed pending arbitration. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 09/23 7:50 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings pending completion of Arbitration : Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2021 at 02:00 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. PLEASE NOTE DATE AND TIME CHANGE.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 769 7488, Passcode: 577278) (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 08/16 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion8 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2021 at 10:00 AM via Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 769 7488, Passcode: 577278) (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
12 12 respm Reply to Response Wed 11/04 4:12 PM
REPLY to Response re11 Response to Motion, filed by Capital Grille Holdings. (Marcello, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
11 11 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/27 6:22 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings pending completion of Arbitration filed by Meaghan Oliveira. Replies due by 11/3/2020. (DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/26 1:16 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings pending completion of Arbitration . Responses due by 10/27/202 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/26/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
10 10 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/20 4:28 PM
Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time filed by Meaghan Oliveira. Responses due by 11/3/2020. (DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/08 10:07 AM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings pending completion of Arbitration . Responses due by 10/20/2020. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/8/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
9 9 motion Extension of Time Mon 10/05 4:17 PM
Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Meaghan Oliveira. Responses due by 10/19/2020. (DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 09/22 1:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings pending completion of Arbitration filed by Capital Grille Holdings. Responses due by 10/6/2020.(Marcello, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/28 1:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Capital Grille Holdings.(Marcello, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/13 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Marcello on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings (Marcello, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/13 8:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meaghan Oliveira. All Defendants.(DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 served summons Capital Grill
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/16 4:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Capital Grille Holdings, GMRI, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Request Tue 06/16 3:48 PM
Summons Request filed by Meaghan Oliveira.(DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, June 12, 2020
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Fri 06/12 5:01 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Fri 06/12 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1516502 ), filed by Meaghan Oliveira.(DeLuca, Amato)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/12 5:00 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]