Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-05619

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:20-ap-50070
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2020
Terminated:Aug 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters
PO Box 501821
Indianapolis, IN 46250
Represented By
Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Gresk
Gresk and Singleton, P.C. 150 E. 10th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Paul Gresk
Gresk And Singleton, PC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, June 03, 2022
utility Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee) Fri 06/03 11:04 AM
Fee due and payable by Trustee Paul D. Gresk for Complaint in the amount of $350.00 Related [+]. (wdp)
Related: [-] 1
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 06/03 8:28 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-50070 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A33123553. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, January 18, 2021
18 18 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 01/18 11:42 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Randolph A Leerkamp I on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk Related [+]. (Leerkamp, Randolph)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
17 17 court Minute Entry/Order Plain Tue 11/17 10:59 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Hearing on Order to Appear re: Defendant, Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters Related [+]. Disposition: Telephonic Hearing held. Court swears in and hears testimony of Joseph Newkirk on behalf of Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters. (hhd)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, November 05, 2020
16 16 misc Withdraw Document Thu 11/05 11:24 AM
Withdrawal of Certificate of Service, filed by Randolph A Leerkamp I on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk Related [+]. (Leerkamp, Randolph)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, November 02, 2020
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/02 7:17 PM
Amended Certificate of Service re: Order to Appear, filed by Randolph A Leerkamp I on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk Related [+]. (Leerkamp, Randolph)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/02 7:12 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order to Appear, filed by Randolph A Leerkamp I on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk Related [+]. (Leerkamp, Randolph)
Related: [-] 12
Sunday, October 25, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Mon 10/26 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 10/25/2020. (Admin)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, October 23, 2020
12 12 order Appear, Order to Fri 10/23 8:59 AM
Order to Appear. Hearing to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:30 AM EST via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. Randolph A Leerkamp I on behalf of Plaintiff Paul D. Gresk will distribute this order. (krb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
11 11 misc Proceedings Supplemental, Motion for Mon 10/19 5:54 PM
Motion for Proceedings Supplemental filed by Randolph A Leerkamp I on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk. (Leerkamp, Randolph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
10 10 court Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/17 3:34 PM
Adversary Proceeding 1:20-ap-50070 Closed. (krb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
9 9 notice Appearance Mon 08/03 7:58 PM
Appearance filed by Randolph A Leerkamp I on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk. (Leerkamp, Randolph)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 02, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Mon 08/03 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 08/02/2020. (Admin)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, July 31, 2020
7 7 order Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Fri 07/31 1:52 PM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters Related [+]. Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (krb)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, July 30, 2020
6 6 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Thu 07/30 3:19 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Paul Gresk on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk. (Gresk, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 07/30 11:15 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters Related [+]. (krb)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
4 4 misc Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of Wed 07/29 5:15 PM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk with Affidavit filed by Paul Gresk on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Gresk. (Gresk, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Mon 06/15 10:56 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters Related [+]. (Gresk, Paul)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 06/15 7:56 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 06/22/2020 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 06/29/2020 . Adversary Answer due by 7/15/2020. (krb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/12 3:41 PM
Adversary case 20-50070 Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Paul Gresk against Defendant(s) Rotor Leasing, LLC dba Freedom Helicopters (Fee deferred: $350) [14 Related [+]]. (Gresk, Paul)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other