Walter v. Centura Health Corporation
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Philip A Brimmer |
Referred: | Nina Y Wang |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01752 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 12, 2020 4:49 AM MST |
Defendant
Centura Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Franklin E Walter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Thu 09/10 3:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Fri 09/04 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Plaintiff Franklin E Walter (Blood, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Memorandum
Tue 08/18 7:37 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding25 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Centura Health Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/18/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stay
Mon 08/17 6:28 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Centura Health Corporation.(Van Pelt, Traci) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/17 6:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Centura Health Corporation.(Van Pelt, Traci) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Ordelheide | ||
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Scheduling Conference Status Conference
Thu 08/13 3:20 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling/Status Conference held on 8/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/05 4:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Belsheim, David) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 08/05 1:09 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Franklin E Walter. (Blood, Timothy) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Mon 07/27 4:53 PM
ORDER granting18 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 8/17/2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/27/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1) |
|
19 | 19
order
Memorandum
Mon 07/27 3:14 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint filed by Centura Health Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/27/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Mon 07/27 2:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint by Defendant Centura Health Corporation.(Van Pelt, Traci) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/14 1:57 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/14/20 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/5/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 07/09 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the court on10 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Although titled a stipulation, the document was filed as a motion. Despite its filing, the court construes the document as the Parties' one stipulation to an extension of time pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a), and thus no order from the court is necessary to effectuate the extension. Per the Stipulation, the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is August 3, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/9/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/09 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Allen Belsheim on behalf of Centura Health CorporationAttorney David Allen Belsheim added to party Centura Health Corporation(pty:dft) (Belsheim, David) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/09 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. McConnell on behalf of Centura Health CorporationAttorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Centura Health Corporation(pty:dft) (McConnell, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/09 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Traci L. Van Pelt on behalf of Centura Health Corporation (Van Pelt, Traci) |
|
12 | 12
order
Memorandum
Thu 07/09 10:21 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Centura Health Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/9/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/09 10:20 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/9/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 07/09 10:06 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Centura Health Corporation.(Van Pelt, Traci) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order
Mon 07/06 4:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/06/2020. It is ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause [Docket No.7 ] is hereby discharged. (athom, ) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 07/06 2:35 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re7 by Plaintiff Franklin E WalterAttorney Timothy Gordon Blood added to party Franklin E Walter(pty:pla).(Blood, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Plaintiff Franklin Walter | ||
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/26 2:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/26/2020. ORDERED that, on or before July 7, 2020 , plaintiff Franklin Walter shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Summons Issued
Tue 06/16 12:06 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 06/16 12:04 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Tue 06/16 11:58 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re:1 Complaint filed by attorneyJordon Robert Harlan. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 06/16 11:55 AM
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX095427 (alave, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Administrative Notice
Tue 06/16 7:27 AM
Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/15 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Centura Health Corporation (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Jordon Robert Harlan added to party Franklin E Walter(pty:pla), filed by Franklin E Walter.(Harlan, Jordon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |