Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Greg Kays
Case #: 4:20-cv-00486
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2020
Terminated:Dec 04, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Dec 12, 2020 3:43 AM CST
Defendant
OnSite Construction
Represented By
Matthew W. Brockman
contact info
Philip V. Sumner
Foland Wickens Roper Hofer & Crawford - Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
CHPB Sub 1, LLC
Represented By
Philip Charles Graham
Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard P.C.
contact info
Katrina L. Smeltzer
Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard, Pc-Kcmo
contact info
Mary Anne Mellow
Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard, Pc-Washington Ave,st. Louis
contact info
Defendant
Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By
Samantha C. Booth
contact info
Debra Bogo-Ernst
Mayer Brown, Llp - Chicago
contact info
Carol Z. Smith
Dysart, Taylor, Cotter, Mcmonigle & Montemore, P.C.
contact info
Matthew William Geary
Dysart, Taylor, Cotter, Mcmonigle & Montemore, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Zieson Construction Company, LLC
Defendant
Stephon Ziegler
Defendant
Torgeson Electric Company, Inc.
3545 SW 6th Avenue
Topeka, KS 66606
Represented By
Jennifer Marie Hannah
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Jean Paul Bradshaw, II
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trustee Matthew L Torgeson
3545 SW 6th Ave.
Topeka, KS 66606
Defendant
Rustin Simon
Represented By
Jamie Hais Steiner
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Courtney Steelman
Husch Blackwell Llp - Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
Simcon Corp
Represented By
Jamie Hais Steiner
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Courtney Steelman
Husch Blackwell Llp - Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
Mets LLC
Defendant
McPherson Contractors, LLC
Defendant
Matthew McPherson
Represented By
Christopher Freeman Burger
Stevens & Brand LLP
contact info
Defendant
MLT Investments LLC
3545 SW 6th Ave.
Topeka, KS 66606
Defendant
Haavig & Associates, LLC
Defendant
Monica Haavig
Defendant
Michael Patrick Dingle
Represented By
Melanie Susan Morgan
Morgan Pilate LLC
contact info
Thomas M. Bradshaw
Van Osdol, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Baucom
Represented By
Matthew W. Brockman
contact info
Philip V. Sumner
Foland Wickens Roper Hofer & Crawford - Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Vazquez Commercial Contracting, LLC
Represented By
Erica Mae Fumagalli
Boyd Kenter Thomas & Parrish Llc-Independence
contact info
Joshua A. Sanders
Boyd Kenter Thomas & Parrish Llc-Independence
contact info
Mark Everett Parrish
Boyd Kenter Thomas & Parrish Llc-Independence
contact info

GPO Nov 20 2020
ORDER granting 20 motion to remand; granting 25 motion to remand. Signed on November 20, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, August 05, 2022
83 83 discov Certificate of Service Fri 08/05 5:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simcon Corp, Rustin Simon filed by Jamie Hais Steiner on behalf of Defendants Simcon Corp, Rustin Simon.(Steiner, Jamie)
Related: [-]