New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:20-cv-04605
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2020
Terminated:Jul 31, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Dec 13, 2020 5:48 AM EST
Defendant
Steve Deutsch
1136 58th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11219
Represented By
Thomas Charles Landrigan
Cohen, Labarbera & Landrigan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shulem Green
1218 59th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11219
Represented By
Thomas Charles Landrigan
Cohen, Labarbera & Landrigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
Justin Ward Lamson
Ballard Spahr Llp (nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 08/06 9:03 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Middle District of Pennsylvania acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:20-cv-01361, filed on 08/04/2020. (sjo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/31 5:02 PM
ORDER: WHEREAS on July 31, 2020, the Court entered an order transferring this case to the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Dkt. 14); IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 7-day waiting period under Local Rule 83.1 is waived, and the Clerk of Court is directed to effectuate the transfer as soon as practicable.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/31/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/31 2:02 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court finds that this case should be transferred for the convenience of the parties and witnesses and in the interests of justice so that it may proceed in the same district where the related foreclosure action is pending and the at-issue real property is located. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Middle District of Pennsylvania. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/31/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court Fri 07/31 2:10 PM
Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re:14 Order,,, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing..(ama)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Fri 07/31 5:04 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Middle District of Pennsylvania.(ama)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 08/04 9:03 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2020. Attorneys Ray Quaglia and Justin Lamson present for the plaintiff. Attorney Oxana Lukina present for the defendants. Court Reporter Khris Sellin present. Case transferred to Middle District of Pennsylvania. (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
13 13 misc Letter Thu 07/23 7:20 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Justin W. Lamson dated July 23, 2020 Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/15 3:58 PM
STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ACKNOWLEDGED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsels as follows: 1. The time within which Defendants SHULEM GREEN and STEVE DEUTSCH shall plead in response to the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs in this matter is hereby extended for an additional thirty (30) days, through and including August 15, 2020. 2. For the purposes of this Stipulation, facsimile,.pdf or email signatures shall be deemed original. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/15/2020) Steve Deutsch answer due 8/15/2020; Shulem Green answer due 8/15/2020. (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/14 12:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Charles Landrigan on behalf of Steve Deutsch, Shulem Green..(Landrigan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation of Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 06/30 3:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Steve Deutsch served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. Service was accepted by Esther Deutsch. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 06/30 3:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Shulem Green served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. Service was accepted by Mrs. Green. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 06/19 2:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steve Deutsch..(jgo)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 06/19 2:52 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shulem Green..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/19 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on July 31, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 4605. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by July 23, 2020, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 7/31/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) Initial Conference set for 7/31/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/18/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/18 4:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steve Deutsch, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/18 4:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shulem Green, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 06/17 11:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin Ward Lamson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Dollar Demand $3,750,000,000; County code Kings;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,750,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 06/17 11:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Ward Lamson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 06/17 11:29 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 06/17 11:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 06/17 11:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/16 12:34 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 06/16 12:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/16 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Steve Deutsch, Shulem Green. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20279128)Document filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION..(Lamson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit B1 - Loan Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B2 - Loan Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit B3 - Loan Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Mortgage,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Guaranty,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Demand Letter