Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: F Keith Ball
Case #: 3:20-cv-00398
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2020
Terminated:Sep 16, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 12, 2020 3:18 AM CST
Defendant
Holy Crab LLC
Defendant
Wei Huang
Represented By
Robert E. Sanders
Young Wells Williams Simmons, PA
contact info
Defendant
Wasabi Sushi & Grill
Plaintiff
Tingyue Yue
Represented By
Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Watson & Norris, PLLC
contact info
Yongbing Zhang - PHV
Law Offices Of Yongbing Zhang
contact info
Robert Nicholas Norris
Watson & Norris, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, September 16, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/16 10:53 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/16/2021 (PG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 09/15 10:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Settlement Conference held on 9/14/2021 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Nick Norris, Yongbing Zhang, Tingyue Yue, Bob Sanders, Wei Huang and Lina Lynn. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
minutes Telephonic Discovery Conference Fri 09/10 1:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 9/10/2021 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Nick Norris, Yongbing Zhang and Bob Sanders. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 09/10 1:52 PM
Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference reset for 9/14/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. By Noon on Monday, September 13, 2021, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 09/02 9:57 AM
Set Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 9/10/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Counsel for the plaintiff shall set up the conference and contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
20 20 motion Discovery Extend Deadline Thu 08/26 3:22 PM
First MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Extend December 31 2021 Deadline by Tingyue Yue (Zhang - PHV, Yongbing)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
19 19 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Tue 03/16 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Request for Production by Tingyue Yue (Zhang - PHV, Yongbing)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Tue 03/16 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories by Tingyue Yue (Zhang - PHV, Yongbing)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
17 17 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Wed 03/10 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Service of First Request for Production by Tingyue Yue (Zhang - PHV, Yongbing)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Wed 03/10 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Tingyue Yue (Zhang - PHV, Yongbing)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
15 15 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Thu 01/21 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Wei Huang (Sanders, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Thu 01/21 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Wei Huang (Sanders, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
13 13 order Case Management Order Fri 12/18 9:31 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 12/23/2020; Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 2/14/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2022, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.550 (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 8/31/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/2/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/2/2021; Motions due by 9/14/2021; Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball; ADR Report due by 12/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/18/2020. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
minutes Telephonic Case Management Conference Fri 12/18 9:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2020 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Nick Norris and Bob Sanders. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 12/09 9:45 AM
RESET Hearing: TIME CHANGE ONLY. Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 12/15/2020 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
12 12 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Mon 11/09 12:17 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/22 1:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Wei Huang.(Sanders, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/02 11:09 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' answers are due 10/22/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/2/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/01 10:34 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint For All Defendants by Wei Huang (Sanders, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/21 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tingyue Yue. Wei Huang served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Watson, Louis)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/21 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tingyue Yue. Holy Crab LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Watson, Louis)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/21 1:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tingyue Yue. Wasabi Sushi & Grill served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Watson, Louis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
6 6 misc Attachment Fri 06/19 10:49 AM
ATTACHMENT, Certificate of Good Standing, re4 MOTION for Yongbing Zhang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4299001)(PG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/19 3:13 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Yongbing Zhang be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/19/2020. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/17 8:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis H. Watson, Jr on behalf of Tingyue Yue (Watson, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/16 4:34 PM
MOTION for Yongbing Zhang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4299001) by Tingyue Yue(Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing for Ohio,
Att: 2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing 7th Circuit,
Att: 3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing N.D. Ill.
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/16 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Tingyue Yue (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/16 11:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Holy Crab LLC, Wei Huang, Wasabi Sushi & Grill. (PG)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/16 8:02 AM
COMPLAINT against Holy Crab LLC, Wei Huang, Wasabi Sushi & Grill ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4297746), filed by Tingyue Yue.(PG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet