Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:20-cv-02538
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2020
Terminated:Oct 26, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Dec 13, 2020 4:13 AM EST
Defendant
Kelvin L. Edwards
Plaintiff
Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC
Represented By
Dustin Sharpes
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, October 26, 2020
17 17 order Judgment - Default Mon 10/26 3:33 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant Kelvin L. Edwards (jpk)
Related: [-]
16 16 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Writ Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 10/26 2:56 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's9 Motion for Immediate Writ of Possession or Writ of Replevin and ISSUES to Plaintiff Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC an immediate writ of possession for the 2019 Freightliner Cascadia with vehicle identification number 3AKJHHDRXKSKH0190. Additionally, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's14 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Defendant and to enter JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Plaintiff shall file a stipulation of voluntary dismissal upon repossession of the Vehicle. If Plaintiff's efforts to repossess the Vehicle fail, Plaintiff should promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/26/2020. (jpk)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 10/26 3:38 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 10/05 10:20 AM
Submission of14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Kelvin L. Edwards to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/29 11:06 AM
EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (adg) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
14 14 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/15 10:55 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Kelvin L. Edwards by Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC.(Sharpes, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/02 12:52 PM
SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 08/24 9:59 AM
Submission of11 Order and9 MOTION for Writ of Possession or Writ of Replevin to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/13 12:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order and Motion for Writ of Possession , as to Kelvin Edwards by Ms. Singleton, co-resident. (Sharpes, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
11 11 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 08/10 12:07 PM
ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to personally serve a copy of this Order and its Motion for Immediate Writ of Possession or Writ of Replevin9 on Defendant within five (5) days of the issuance of this Order. The Court additionally DIRECTS Plaintiff to immediately file proof of service on the docket once service is accomplished. If Defendant intends to respond to Plaintiffs motion, he must do so by filing a response on the docket within seven (7) days of the date on which Plaintiff personally serves him a copy of this Order and its motion. Defendants failure to respond to Plaintiffs motion will indicate that Defendant does not oppose Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff must file any reply within five (5) days Defendant's response. Lastly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to re-submit this matter to the undersigned twelve (12) days after the issuance of this Order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 08/10/20. (aaq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/04 9:23 AM
SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
9 9 motion Writ Mon 08/03 5:08 PM
MOTION for Writ of Possession or Writ of Replevin with Brief In Support by Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC. (Sharpes, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Mon 07/13 4:45 PM
Return of Service Executed by Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC. Kelvin L. Edwards served on 7/12/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/13 9:58 AM
FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/09 3:14 PM
ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining Order as found in its1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/9/2020. (jed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/02 8:19 AM
FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
4 4 12 pgs order Order Wed 06/17 9:20 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/16 4:55 PM
Third Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (jpk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 06/16 4:54 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Kelvin L. Edwards. (jpk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/16 4:53 PM
Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order, Writ of Replevin, and Declaratory Relief; and COMPLAINT for Damages filed by Interstate Equipment Leasing, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9805905). (jpk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 06/16 4:56 PM
Submission of1 Complaint to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
Related: [-]