Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-20175
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2020
Terminated:Jan 28, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jan 09, 2022 1:41 PM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Annika Marie Miranda
United States Attorney'S Office - Sdfl
contact info
Alexander J. Kramer
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Katherine Raut
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Peter A. Laserna
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3)
Terminated: 01/28/2021
Represented By
Fernando LaTour Tamayo
Coffey Burlington
contact info
Kendall Brindley Coffey
Coffey Burlington, P.L.
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 6:08 AM EST
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Juan Ribas Domenech, Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles, Felipe Moncaleano Botero. (yha) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Juan Ribas Domenech (1), Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles (2), Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
3 3 13 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Juan Ribas Domenech (1), Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles (2), Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3). (yha) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
10 10 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Initial Appearance as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero held on 2/18/2020. Date of Arrest or Surrender: 2/17/2020.. Arraignment set for 3/3/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 2/24/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 3/3/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 2/24/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. CASE REMAINS SEALED (Digital 13:59:26) Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 2/18/2020. (yha) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fernando LaTour Tamayo appearing for Felipe Moncaleano Botero (yha) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Detention Hearing as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero held on 2/24/2020. Detention hearing to be continued before Judge Torres TBD by defense counsel. ( Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 3/9/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate.). This hearing is not sealed but CASE REMAINS SEALED (Digital 11:00:04) (dgj) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kendall Brindley Coffey appearing for Felipe Moncaleano Botero (dgj) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
16 16 MOTION to Amend Sealing2 Order and for Protective Order by USA as to Juan Ribas Domenech, Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles, Felipe Moncaleano Botero. (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
17 17 SEALED ORDER16 Motion to Amend Sealing2 Order by USA as to Juan Ribas Domenech, Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles, Felipe Moncaleano Botero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 2/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
Set/Hearings as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero: Preliminary Examination is continued to 4/3/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
22 22 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero. (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER Granting22 Motion to Seal as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
24 24 CONSENT MOTION to Continue Preliminary Examination and Exclude Time Under The Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero. (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER Granting24 Consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Examination and Exclude Time Under The Speedy Trial Act as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
30 30 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero. Detention Hearing set for 2/28/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (mdc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
31 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Detention Hearing as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero held on 2/28/2020 Bond recommendation/set: Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3) $150K CSB w/Nebbia and co-signers. (Digital 10:16:55) (yha) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
35 35 2 pgs NOTICE OF PERMANENT APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES: Fernando LaTour Tamayo, Kendall Brindley Coffey appearing for Felipe Moncaleano Botero (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero (cg1) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
45 45 JOINT NOTICE SEEKING LIMITED SEALING by USA as to Juan Ribas Domenech, Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles, Felipe Moncaleano Botero (nc) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 19, 2020
46 46 1 pgs ORDER UNSEALING DOCKET. The Clerk of Court is hereby Ordered to unseal this case in its entirety as to Juan Ribas Domenech, Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles, Felipe Moncaleano Botero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (nf) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
Reset Hearings as to Juan Ribas Domenech, Jose Vicente Gomez Aviles, Felipe Moncaleano Botero: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Arraignment reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination reset for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (cg1) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
49 49 Second MOTION to Continue with Consent Preliminary Examination and Exclude Time Under The Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero. Responses due by 4/7/2020(Kramer, Alexander) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
50 50 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Katherine Raut appearing for USA. . Attorney Katherine Raut added to party USA(pty:pla). (Raut, Katherine) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
53 53 7 pgs Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Regulating Disclosure of Discovery Information by USA as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero. Responses due by 4/8/2020(Raut, Katherine) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Certification
Thursday, March 26, 2020
54 54 ORDER granting49 Motion to Continue as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3). Arraignment set for 5/18/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 5/18/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 3/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (tb) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
59 59 ORDER granting53 Motion for Protective Order as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
62 62 Third MOTION to Continue with Consent Preliminary Examination and Exclude Time Under The Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero. Responses due by 5/26/2020(Kramer, Alexander) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 14, 2020
63 63 ORDER granting62 Motion to Continue as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3). Arraignment set for 6/18/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 6/18/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 5/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (aw) [1:20-mj-02228-JJO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
64 64 6 pgs INFORMATION as to Felipe Moncaleano Botero (3) count(s) 1. (jao)
Related: [-]