Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11597

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:20-bk-11600
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2020
Terminated:Feb 18, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
New Athens Generating Company, LLC
1780 Hughes Landing Blvd Ste 800
The Woodlands, TX 77380-4014
Represented By
Jason M. Madron
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
8 8 claims Claims Register Wed 04/14 3:27 PM
Final Claims Register (Alpha) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Numeric) Final Claim Register
Thursday, February 18, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 02/18 7:11 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
7 7 order Final Decree Wed 02/17 6:30 PM
Final Decree (A) Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases; (B) Directing That the Administration of All Claims Asserted in the Closing Cases Be Resolved in the Lead Case; and (C) Granting Related Relief Signed on 2/17/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 07/16 10:57 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by New Athens Generating Company, LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 07/16 10:55 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by New Athens Generating Company, LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 06/19 11:57 AM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Cases Under Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) and Local Rule 1015-1. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of: North East Gas Generation, LLC, Case No. 20-11597 North East Gas Generation GP, LLC, Case No. 20-11598 Millennium Power Partners, L.P., Case No. 20-11599 and New Athens Generating Company, LLC, Case No. 20-11600 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 20-11597 (MFW). Related [+] Signed on 6/19/2020. (LMC)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, June 18, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 06/18 1:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-11600 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9833052, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Thu 06/18 12:40 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Millennium Power Partners, L.P., New Athens Generating Company, LLC, NorthEast Gas Generation GP, LLC, NorthEast Gas Generation, LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 06/18 12:26 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by New Athens Generating Company, LLC. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 06/18 1:03 PM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB)
Related: [-]