New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:20-cv-04703
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2020
Re-opened:Oct 25, 2021
Terminated:Jan 25, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 15, 2020 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Jonathan Hannestad
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Giulio Profumo
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lorenzo Pellegrino
Represented By
Vincent Ted Chang
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Philip Ransom Schatz
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Adam M Bialek
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Adam Michael Bialek
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Defendant
Salvatore Palella
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Neteller (US) Inc.
Represented By
William Francis Dahill
Dunnington Bartholow Miller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Skrill USA Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Thomas Johnson, III
Dunnington Bartholow Miller LLP
contact info
William Francis Dahill
Dunnington Bartholow Miller LLP
contact info
Samuel Asher Blaustein
Dunnington, Bartholow & Miller, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Helbiz, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Justin Guiliano
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Coppola
Defendant
Stefano Ciravegna
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Saeed Aldarmaki
Plaintiff
Filippo Bulgarini d'Elci
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Barron
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Abhishek Sikaria
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Tarek Rahman
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Dong Seok Lee
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniils Lebedeus
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Rishi Khanchandani
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Marat Garibyan
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Denis Desari
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Plaintiff
Illia Cheherst
Represented By
Karen Anne Newirth
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Scott Rauscher
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Mike Kanovitz
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Milos Citovek
Terminated: 10/28/2020
Represented By
Zeev Kirsh
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
357 357 ORDER: The Court now Orders as follows: 1. Defendants Salvatore Palella, Lorenzo Pellegrino, Giulio Profumo, Jonathan Hannestad, Justin Giuliano and the Chief Executive Officer of micromobility.com Inc., shall by May 8, 2025, each file a declaration under penalty of perjury, executed in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1746, with a listing in full compliance with paragraph 1 of the April 17, 2025 Order. This requires each of the foregoing to "list... all electronic devices in their possession and control, including any and all smart phones, desktop computers, laptop computers, tablets, servers and electronic storage devices that contain data or communications from the relevant time period identified by the parties on the record." 2. By May 8, 2025 micromobility.com Inc. shall submit a declaration from the person most knowledgeable of micromobility.com Inc.'s use of electronic storage devices, including servers, cloud services, data storage services, desktop computers, laptop computers, tablets, smart phones, during the time period of November 15, 2017 to May 4, 2021 describing with particularity the electronic storage device, the period it was in use, whether it was sold, transferred, disposed of, erased, deleted or modified and its present whereabouts; the declaration shall set forth the date micromobility.com Inc. first subscribed to "Google Workspace" or its predecessor "G Suite" and any ending date to its subscription for these services. 3. By May 2, 2025, defendants shall show cause in writing why micromobility.com Inc. ought not be ordered to search for ESI in its possession or control of or relating to the nine so-called "custodians" identified in the plaintiffs' letter of April 28, 2025. (ECF 354 at 2-4.) 4. DEFENDANTS SALVATORE PALELLA, LORENZO PELLEGRINO, GIULIO PROFUMO, JONATHAN HANNESTAD, JUSTIN GIULIANO AND MICROMOBILITY.COM INC. AND THEIR COUNSEL ARE ADVISED THAT THE FAILURE TO FULLY COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER AND THE ORDER OF APRIL 17, 2025 MAY RESULT IN PUNISHMENT FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT AND ANY SANCTIONS ENUMERATED IN RULE 37, FED. R. CIV. P., INCLUDING STRIKING THE NON-COMPLIANT DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND ENTRY OF A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST THE DEFENDANT. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/29/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
356 356 order Memo Endorsement Tue 04/29 1:29 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:351 MOTION for Aaron Lawson to Withdraw as Attorney . filed by Saeed Aldarmaki. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/29/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
355 355 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/29 10:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW granting351 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. After reviewing the Motion, and for satisfactory reasons having been shown, the Court finds that the request should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, by the Court that Aaron Lawson is hereby granted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Saeed Al Darmaki in this matter and the Clerk is ordered to remove Mr. Lawson from this action's CM/ECF service list. SO ORDERED. Attorney Aaron Lawson terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/29/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
354 354 misc Letter Tue 04/29 10:29 AM
AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Plaintiffs dated 4/29/2025 re: Defendants' Letter Re: ESI (Corrected). Document filed by Anthony Calixte, Ryan Barron, Illia Cheherst, Denis Desari, Grant Echols, Francisco Pereira, Marat Garibyan, Kameel Jiwa, Rishi Khanchandani, Daniils Lebedeus, Dong Seok Lee, Tarek Rahman, Abhishek Sikaria, Andrew Szklarek, Filippo Bulgarini d'Elci..(Green, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Ex.1 Meta Subpoena Response,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Pls' Subpoena to Meta,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 April 22, 2025 Letter from Mr. Kanovitz to Mr. Heim,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Whistleblower Report,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit Ex. 5 Al-Darmaki WhatsApp Production,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 July 2020 Letter from Mr. Kanovitz
Monday, April 28, 2025
353 353 12 pgs misc Letter Mon 04/28 11:10 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Plaintiffs dated 4/28/2025 re: Defendants' Letter Re: ESI. Document filed by Anthony Calixte, Ryan Barron, Illia Cheherst, Denis Desari, Grant Echols, Francisco Pereira, Marat Garibyan, Kameel Jiwa, Rishi Khanchandani, Daniils Lebedeus, Dong Seok Lee, Tarek Rahman, Abhishek Sikaria, Andrew Szklarek, Filippo Bulgarini d'Elci..(Green, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex.1 Meta Subpoena Response,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Pls' Subpoena to Meta,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 April 22, 2025 Letter from Mr. Kanovitz to Mr. Heim,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Whistleblower Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Al-Darmaki WhatsApp Production,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 July 2020 Letter from Mr. Kanovitz
352 352 misc Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 04/28 1:32 PM
PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Saeed Aldarmaki. Related Document Number:351 ..(Lawson, Aaron)
Related: [-]
351 351 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/28 1:30 PM
MOTION for Aaron Lawson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Saeed Aldarmaki..(Lawson, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
350 350 25 pgs misc Letter Thu 04/24 10:19 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Plaintiffs dated 4/24/2025 re: Letter in Response to Court's Order at 346. Document filed by Anthony Calixte, Ryan Barron, Illia Cheherst, Denis Desari, Grant Echols, Francisco Pereira, Marat Garibyan, Kameel Jiwa, Rishi Khanchandani, Daniils Lebedeus, Dong Seok Lee, Tarek Rahman, Abhishek Sikaria, Andrew Szklarek, Filippo Bulgarini d'Elci..(Green, Isaac)
Related: [-]
349 349 4 pgs misc Letter Thu 04/24 9:42 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Robert Heim dated April 24, 2025 re: Information Required by Court's Order. Document filed by Justin Guiliano, Jonathan Hannestad, Salvatore Palella, Lorenzo Pellegrino, Giulio Profumo, micromobility.com Inc...(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Facebook Post,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email Correspondence
348 348 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Thu 04/24 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/17/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
347 347 misc Transcript Thu 04/24 4:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/17/2025 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]