Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:20-cr-00094
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2020
Last checked: Friday Jun 19, 2020 3:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Jennifer Bousquet (2)
Represented By
Justin T. Smith
Duffy Law, LLC
contact info
William H. Paetzold
Moriarty , Paetzold & Sherwood, Llc-Gstnby
contact info
Defendant
Anatoly Braylovsky (1)
Represented By
Bruce D. Koffsky
Koffsky & Felsen, LLC
contact info
James I. Glasser
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Trowbridge Pierpont
Us Attorney'S Office - Ct
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/19/2020 3:53 AM EDT
Friday, May 29, 2020
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Jennifer Bousquet (1). (Caffrey, A.) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Anatoly Braylovsky (1). (Caffrey, A.) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 SEALED MOTION to Seal - by USA as to Jennifer Bousquet. (Caffrey, A.) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED MOTION to Seal - by USA as to Anatoly Braylovsky. (Caffrey, A.) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Sealed Motion to Seal as to Jennifer Bousquet (1). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 5/29/2020. (Caffrey, A.) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Sealed Motion to Seal as to Anatoly Braylovsky (1). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 5/29/2020. (Caffrey, A.) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
Arrest of Jennifer Bousquet. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
CASE UNSEALED as to Jennifer Bousquet. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Anatoly Braylovsky. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
CASE UNSEALED as to Anatoly Braylovsky. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal Affidavit Attached to the Complaint by USA as to Jennifer Bousquet.(Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 78 pgs Affidavit
5 5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Anatoly Braylovsky. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Jennifer Bousquet. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector:Initial Appearance as to Anatoly Braylovsky held on 6/4/2020, Detention Hearing as to Anatoly Braylovsky held on 6/4/2020, Motion Hearing as to Anatoly Braylovsky held on 6/4/2020 re5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA. Added Attorney Bruce Koffsky for Anatoly Braylovsky, (Probable Cause Hearing set for June 18, 2020 at 9:30AM); Total Time: 1 hours and 15 minutes.(Court Reporter D. Huntington.)(Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Initial Appearance as to Jennifer Bousquet held on 6/4/2020, Detention Hearing as to Jennifer Bousquet held on 6/4/2020, Motion Hearing as to Jennifer Bousquet held on 6/4/2020 re 6 MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA, Bond set for 150,000.00, Case Unsealed. Added Attorney Justin Smith. Total time 38 minutes.(Court Reporter D. Huntington.)(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified on 6/5/2020 to include attorney (Murphy, Tatihana). [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to Anatoly Braylovsky - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/4/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Jennifer Bousquet (1). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/4/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Seal Affidavit by USA as to Anatoly Braylovsky.(Pierpont, John) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Redacted Affidavit
9 9 Appearance Bond (Unsecured Surety) Entered as to Jennifer Bousquet in amount of $ 150,000.00. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting5 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Anatoly Braylovsky (1). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 06/04/2020. (Spector, Robert) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jennifer Bousquet Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/4/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER granting8 Motion to Seal as to Anatoly Braylovsky (1). For the reasons set forth in the government's Motion to Seal [Doc. No. 8], the Clerk of the Court is directed to seal the Complaint Affidavit, which is Document No. 1-1. The government has filed, as an unsealed document, a redacted version of the Complaint Affidavit which is available on the public docket [Doc. No. 8-1]. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 06/04/2020. (Spector, Robert) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Jennifer Bousquet. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Anatoly Braylovsky: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Probable Cause Hearing set for 6/18/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
12 12 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jennifer Bousquet. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
13 13 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to Jennifer Bousquet - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/4/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Jennifer Bousquet: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Probable Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
15 15 ORDER granting5 Motion to Seal as to Jennifer Bousquet (1). For the reasons set forth in the government's Motion to Seal [Doc. No. 5], the Clerk of the Court is directed to seal the Complaint Affidavit, which is Document No. 1-1. The government has filed, as an unsealed document, a redacted version of the Complaint Affidavit which is available on the public docket [Doc. No. 5-1]. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 06/08/2020. (Spector, Robert) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
16 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William H. Paetzold appearing for Jennifer Bousquet (Paetzold, William) [3:20-mj-00468-RMS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
12 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James I. Glasser appearing for Anatoly Braylovsky (Glasser, James) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom as to Anatoly Braylovsky: The Bond Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2020 at 3:30PM will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1601664043?pwd=bUZ1cGo2eVFvYk1Mb3RGVC9TeEVtZz09 and call in number is 1 (646) 828-7666. Meeting ID: 160 166 4043 Meeting Password: 159592 Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Anatoly Braylovsky: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Bond Hearing via Zoom set for 6/11/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please see Notice Regarding Hearing via Zoom for log-in details. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION for Release from Custody [MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANT ANATOLY BRAYLOVSKY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE] by Anatoly Braylovsky. (Glasser, James) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: granting14 Motion for Release from Custody as to Anatoly Braylovsky (1); Bond Hearing as to Anatoly Braylovsky held on 6/11/2020; Motion Hearing as to Anatoly Braylovsky held on 6/11/2020 re14 MOTION for Release from Custody [MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANT ANATOLY BRAYLOVSKY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE] filed by Anatoly Braylovsky. Probable Cause hearing set for June 18, 2020 at 9:30AM. $750,000.00 Secured Surety Appearance Bond set. Total Time: 1 hours and 18 minutes.(Court Reporter J. Monette.) (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
19 19 Cash Bond Entered as to Anatoly Braylovsky in amount of $ 500,000.00, Receipt # 783500. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
16 16 Appearance (Secured, Surety) Bond Entered as to Anatoly Braylovsky in amount of $ 750,000.00. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Anatoly Braylovsky Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/11/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
18 18 SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Anatoly Braylovsky. (Murphy, Tatihana) Modified filed date on 6/15/2020 (Murphy, Tatihana). [3:20-mj-00469-RMS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
21 21 7 pgs INDICTMENT returned before Judge Robert M. Spector with the signature of the foreperson redacted. Grand jury number N-19-1 as to Anatoly Braylovsky (1) count(s) 1, 2, 4-5, Jennifer Bousquet (2) count(s) 1, 3. (Caffrey, A.)
Related: [-]
22 22 Unredacted document with FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE as to defendant(s)Jennifer Bousquet, Anatoly Braylovsky. Access to the pdf document is restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(e). (Caffrey, A.)
Related: [-]
23 23 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to Jennifer Bousquet, Anatoly Braylovsky - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/17/2020. (Caffrey, A.)
Related: [-]