Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Callie V S Granade
Referred: Sonja F Bivins
Case #: 1:14-cv-00209
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:May 07, 2014
Terminated:May 27, 2014
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 7:33 PM CST
Defendant
Ebrahim Maghsoud
Plaintiff
SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By
James S. Harvey
Mcdowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.
contact info
Jonathan Michael Lieb
Mcdowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 27, 2014
6 6 ORDER re:5 notice of dismissal, action DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/27/2014. (mab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2014
5 5 NOTICE by SE Property Holdings, LLC Notice of Dismissal (Lieb, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2014
4 4 Service Notice issued 5/7/2014. Plaintiff's Notice of Service Attempts due 6/23/2014. (mab)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Ebrahim Maghsoud. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/7/2014) (mab).
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs SE Property Holdings, LLC, Park National Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Park National Corporation for SE Property Holdings, LLC.. (Lieb, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Ebrahim Maghsoud ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1578155, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Lieb, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons