Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Mary S Mcelroy
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:20-cv-00271
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2020
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 16, 2020 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
Salim Kabawat
Represented By
Mark P. Dolan
Rice Dolan & Kershaw
contact info
James S. D'Ambra
Rice Dolan & Kershaw
contact info
Defendant
Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By
Mark P. Dolan
Rice Dolan & Kershaw
contact info
James S. D'Ambra
Rice Dolan & Kershaw
contact info
Defendant
Quest Diagnostics LLC
Represented By
Mark P. Dolan
Rice Dolan & Kershaw
contact info
James S. D'Ambra
Rice Dolan & Kershaw
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Burbank
Represented By
Amato A. DeLuca
Deluca & Associates, Ltd
contact info
Matthew D. Provencher
Deluca & Weizenbaum, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Ogarek
Represented By
Amato A. DeLuca
Deluca & Associates, Ltd
contact info
Matthew D. Provencher
Deluca & Weizenbaum, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
order Order Entering Stipulation Mon 12/16 8:16 AM
TEXT Order Entering100 STIPULATION of filing of Dismissal. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/16/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
100 100 misc Stipulation Fri 12/13 12:00 PM
STIPULATION of filing of Dismissal Stipulation filed by Quest Diagnostics Massachusetts LLC. (Dolan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
99 99 notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Tue 12/10 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Calendar Call set for 1/17/2025 at 10:00 AM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]