Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-40883

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:20-ap-04044
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2020
Terminated:Jun 09, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.
600 Washington Ave. Ste. 2500
St. Louis, MO 63101
Represented By
Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Payless Holdings, LLC
7700 Forsyth Blvd Suite 1800
St. Louis, MO 63105
Represented By
Richard W. Engel, Jr.
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, June 11, 2022
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/11 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 06/11/2022. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33
Thursday, June 09, 2022
33 33 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - AP Thu 06/09 4:02 PM
Order Dismissing Case . (pri, m)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 06/09 4:04 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:20-ap-4044: Dismissed. (pri, m)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/09 4:06 PM
Adversary Case 4:20-ap-4044 Closed (pri, m)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
32 32 misc Stipulation Mon 06/06 3:57 PM
Stipulation By Payless Holdings, LLC and / Dismissal With Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
court Hearing Held Wed 04/14 10:25 AM
Status Conference Hearing Held Related [+] (how, j)
Related: [-] 28 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/18 7:38 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Related [+]. (jer, j)
Related: [-] 28 Amended Complaint by Richard W. Engel Jr. on behalf of Payless Holdings, LLC against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 20-04044 Complaint by Payless Holdings, LLC (attorney Richard W. Engel Jr.) against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC). filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
30 30 answer Response Wed 03/17 2:01 PM
Response /Answer Filed by Defendant Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Related [+]. (Bossi, Mark). NOTE: THE COURT HAS RE-DOCKETED THIS PLEADING AS AN ANSWER, SEE DOCKET ENTRY31 . Modified on 3/18/2021 (jer, j)
Related: [-] 28 Amended Complaint by Richard W. Engel Jr. on behalf of Payless Holdings, LLC against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 20-04044 Complaint by Payless Holdings, LLC (attorney Richard W. Engel Jr.) against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC).
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
court Hearing Held Wed 03/03 10:11 AM
Hearing Not Held Related [+] - Trial to be continued. (JohnHowley)
Related: [-] 28 Amended Complaint filed by Payless Holdings, LLC
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/17 5:58 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 28 Amended Complaint
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/17 5:53 PM
Amended Complaint by Richard W. Engel Jr. on behalf of Payless Holdings, LLC against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.. Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-04044 Complaint by Payless Holdings, LLC (attorney Richard W. Engel Jr.) against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
27 27 order Amend Wed 02/17 3:33 PM
Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing Related [+], Granting Motion To Amend, Granting Motion To Vacate (jer, j)
Related: [-] 22 Related Doc #24 24
26 26 audio Wed 02/17 11:00 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/17/2021 10:13:23 AM ]. File Size [ 3407 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:06 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 02/17 11:39 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Granted per the announcements at the hearing - submit order. (how, j)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC,24 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC, Motion to Vacate
Friday, February 12, 2021
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/12 9:25 AM
Certificate of Service of Asir U. Ashraf Regarding The Reorganized Debtors' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Vacate Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, Reorganized Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Scheduling an Expedited Hearing, (II) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (III) Granted Related Relief, and Notice of Hearing Filed by Other Professional Prime Clerk LLC Related [+]. (Pagan, Chanel) Modified on 2/12/2021 (jer, j). Modified on 2/12/2021 (jer, j)
Related: [-] 24 Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint and to Vacate Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum in Support,22 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents24 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Vacate Scheduling Order) ,23 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
24 24 motion Amend Thu 02/11 8:39 AM
Motion to Amend Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, Motion to Vacate (related documents18 Scheduling Order) Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Hearing scheduled 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (jer, j
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/10 4:33 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for24 and for22 , (Engel, Richard) Modified on 2/11/2021 (jer, j)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Amend Complaint and to Vacate Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Hearing scheduled 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC,22 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents24 Motion to Amend Complaint and to Vacate Scheduling Order) Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Hearing scheduled 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
22 22 motion Expediting Hearing Wed 02/10 4:00 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Hearing scheduled 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard) Modified on 2/11/2021 (jer, j). Modified on 2/11/2021 (jer, j)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Amend Complaint and Vacate/Set Aside Scheduling Order
21 21 motion Generic Motion Wed 02/10 3:56 PM
Motion to / For Leave to Amend Complaint and to Vacate Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Hearing scheduled 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard). NOTE: THE COURT HAS RE-DOCKETED THIS PLEADING AS A MOTION TO AMEND, VACATE/SET ASIDE, SEE DOCKET ENTRY24 . Modified on 2/11/2021 (jer, j)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 09, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/09 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/09/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/09 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/09/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, January 07, 2021
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/07 8:20 AM
Amended Scheduling Order for Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Administrative Expense Claim and Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Trial date set for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLCi, k
17 17 10 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 01/07 8:17 AM
Stipulation and Order Regarding Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure Related [+]
Related: [-] i, k
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/27 2:00 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery shall be completed on or before 11/19/2020. Trial date set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (bai, j)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
Friday, October 02, 2020
15 15 misc Discovery Fri 10/02 3:06 PM
Discovery: Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1), As Made Applicable by Bankruptcy Rule 7026 (list of witnesses, exhibits, proposed findings, etc.) Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, September 28, 2020
14 14 court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 09/28 10:46 AM
Receipt Number 8173604, Fee Amount $100.00 Related [+] (jer, j)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Defendant Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.
Sunday, September 27, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/28 7:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 09/27/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, September 25, 2020
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 09/25 2:56 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael S. Weinstein Related [+] (Hav, J)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 09/25 10:41 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael S. Weinstein Filed by Defendant Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. (Bossi, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/24 5:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Related [+]. (Bossi, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-04044 Complaint by Payless Holdings, LLC (attorney Richard W. Engel Jr.) against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
Friday, August 28, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/28 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/28/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/26 9:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John G. Willard Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC. (Willard, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/26 3:52 PM
Amended Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due by 10/15/2020. Trial date set for 11/18/2020 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Hav, J)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
Monday, August 24, 2020
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/24 2:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Erin M. Edelman Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/19 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Issuance of Summons
Thursday, July 09, 2020
4 4 court Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued Thu 07/09 12:50 PM
Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued on Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Date Issued 7/9/2020, Answer Due 8/10/2020 Trial date set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/09 12:43 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due by 9/8/2020. Trial date set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Payless Holdings, LLC
Friday, June 19, 2020
2 2 crditcrd Internet Credit Card Receipt Fri 06/19 1:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 20-04044 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A17384531, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 1:40 PM
Adversary case 20-04044 Complaint by Payless Holdings, LLC (attorney Richard W. Engel Jr.) against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]