Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:20-cv-03009
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2020
Terminated:Apr 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 19, 2020 4:10 AM EST
Defendant
URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC.
Represented By
NEAHA P. RAOL
Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP
contact info
DANA E. BECKER
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
DOUGLAS W. BARUCH
Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP
contact info
LINDSEY TITUS LEVY
Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LE TOTE INC.
Represented By
DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
MARK S. COHEN
Cohen & Gresser
contact info
DAVID F. LISNER
Cohen & Gresser
contact info
RONALD WICK
Cohen & Gresser LLP
contact info
DANIELLE NICOLE DHIR
Cohen & Gresser LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 24 2021
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/24/2021. 6/24/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
GPO Jun 24 2021
ORDERED AND DECREED THAT: DEFENDANTS MOTION IS DENIED1 WITH RESPECT TO COUNTS I IV, AND; PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR UNFAIR COMPETITION (COUNT V) IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/24/2021. 6/24/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
192 192 misc Bill of Costs Thu 06/20 11:59 AM
BILL OF COSTS by URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC..(BECKER, DANA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - R. Tondon Dep. Invoice (2022.06.22),
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - R. Tondon Dep. Invoice (2022.06.23),
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - R. Tondon Dep. Invoice (2022.06.23) (video),
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - R. Tondon Dep. Invoice (2022.06.24),
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - R. Tondon Dep. Invoice (2022.06.22) (video),
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - R. Tondon Dep. Invoice (2022.06.24) (video),
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - C. Bowman Dep. Invoice (fact),
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 - C. Bowman Dep. Invoice (video),
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 - C. Bowman Dep. Invoice (expert),
Att: 12 Exhibit 10 - B. Northart Dep. Invoice,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11 - B. Northart Dep. Invoice (video),
Att: 14 Exhibit 12 - D. Hayne Dep. Invoice (fact & 30(b)(6)),
Att: 15 Exhibit 13 - I. Ratner Dep. Invoice (expert),
Att: 16 Exhibit 14 - R. Hartman Dep. Invoice,
Att: 17 Exhibit 15 - R. Hartman Dep. Invoice (video),
Att: 18 Exhibit 16 - C. Irwin Dep. Invoice (expert),
Att: 19 Exhibit 17 - K. Gallagher Dep. Invoice,
Att: 20 Exhibit 18 - J. Stratter Dep. Invoice (fact),
Att: 21 Exhibit 19 - J. Stratter Dep. Invoice (30(b)(6)),
Att: 22 Exhibit 20 - S. Hopper Dep. Invoice (expert),
Att: 23 Exhibit 21 - S. Hopper Dep. Invoice (video),
Att: 24 Exhibit 22 - J. Tagliani Dep. Invoice,
Att: 25 Exhibit 23 - J. Tagliani Dep. Invoice (video),
Att: 26 Exhibit 24 - C. Dadia Dep. Invoice (fact),
Att: 27 Exhibit 25 - A. Rosenwinkel Dep. Invoice (fact & 30(b)(6)),
Att: 28 Exhibit 26 - M. Marein-Efron Dep. Invoice (fact),
Att: 29 Exhibit 27 - M. Marein-Efron Dep. Invoice (30(b)(6)),
Att: 30 Exhibit 28 - C. Thompson Dep. Invoice,
Att: 31 Exhibit 29 - F. Conforti Dep. Invoice (fact & 30(b)(6)),
Att: 32 Exhibit 30 - C. Hollinger Dep. Invoice (fact & 30(b)(6)),
Att: 33 Exhibit 31 - E. Kremer Dep. Invoice,
Att: 34 Exhibit 32 - S. Sundar Dep. Invoice,
Att: 35 Exhibit 33 - Final Invoice from Court Reporter,
Att: 36 Exhibit 34 - Morgan Lewis Witness Sofitel Invoice Redacted,
Att: 37 Exhibit 35 - C. Irwin Flight Redacted,
Att: 38 Exhibit 36 - S. Hopper Flight