Maine Premier Soccer, LLC
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Janet E Bostwick |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-11358 |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2020 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 30, 2020 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 31, 2020 |
Debtor
Maine Premier Soccer, LLC
426 Bridge St
Westbrook, ME 04092-3189 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Trustee
Harold B. Murphy
Murphy & King, P.C. One Beacon Street
Boston, MA 02108 |
Docket last updated: 06/23/2020 12:09 AM EDT |
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 06/22 1:18 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 20-11358 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 18848658, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b (Use for AutoAssign Only)
Mon 06/22 11:57 AM
DISREGARD: Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 07/30/2020 at 09:30 AM as a Telephonic Meeting. (admin, ) Modified on 6/22/2020 (sl) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (Asset)
Mon 06/22 3:12 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/30/2020 at 09:30 AM as Telephonic Meeting. Proofs of Claims due by 8/31/2020. Government proof of claim due by 12/21/2020. (sl) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 06/22 11:36 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing Fee in the Amount of $335 Filed by Maine Premier Soccer, LLC. (Cohn, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Vote
Mon 06/22 11:37 AM
Certificate of Vote filed by Debtor Maine Premier Soccer, LLC (Cohn, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Mon 06/22 11:38 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor Maine Premier Soccer, LLC (Cohn, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order to Update
Mon 06/22 3:54 PM
Order to Update Re:1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Matrix Due 6/23/2020.Disclosure of Ownership Statement Rule 1007(a)(1) ,Atty Disclosure Statement ,Schedules A-H ,Statement of Financial Affairs ,Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/6/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 7/6/2020. (nr) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix
Mon 06/22 5:40 PM
Verification of Creditor Matrix filed by Debtor Maine Premier Soccer, LLC (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix | ||
6 | 6
misc
Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix
Mon 06/22 6:09 PM
Verification of Creditor Matrix (Corrected) filed by Debtor Maine Premier Soccer, LLC (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix |