Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Cheryl R Zwart
Case #: 4:20-cv-03073
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Terminated:Nov 16, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Dec 20, 2020 6:13 AM CST
Cross Claimant
Shirley Olson
Represented By
James E. Reisinger
Reisinger, Booth Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
Anne Valgora
Represented By
Maren L. Chaloupka
Chaloupka, Holyoke Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Shirley Olson
as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Olson Whitmore Law Office 7602 Pacific Street Suite 200
Omaha, NE 68114
Represented By
James E. Reisinger
Reisinger, Booth Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Anne Valgora
Represented By
Maren L. Chaloupka
Chaloupka, Holyoke Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
New York Life Insurance Company
Goosmann Law Firm, PLC 17838 Burke Street Suite 250
Omaha, NE 68118
Represented By
Patrick E. McNamara
Goosmann Law Firm - Omaha
contact info

GPO Oct 24 2020
ORDER on 7 Motion to Stay and 12 Objection to Stay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
GPO Nov 03 2020
ORDER Plaintiff may deposit a check in the amount of $101,369.63 with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. This represents the principal amount owed for the policy death benefit plus interest accrued as required by law. The Clerk is directed to deposit the aforementioned funds into an interest-bearing account until further order of this court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2041 and NECivR 67.1.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (E-mailed to Finance)(LRM)
GPO Dec 31 2021
ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's findings and recommendation (filing 18) are adopted. New York Life Insurance Company is terminated as a party to this case. This case is administratively closed pending resolution of State v. Anne M. Valgora, Case No. CR 19-651, in the District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska. Counsel for Valgora is directed to report to the Court every 6 months regarding the status of the state court proceedings. The Clerk of the Court shall set an initial status report deadline of July 1, 2021. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
GPO Nov 16 2022
ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall distribute the interpleaded funds of $101,369.63 along with any accumulated interest to crossclaimant Shirley Olson. The crossclaimant shall complete IRS Form W-9 and submit the completed form to the Clerk of the Court via email at NEDml_FinancialAdmin@ned.uscourts.gov so that funds may be distributed. The January 18, 2023 status report deadline is terminated. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (E-mailed to Finance)(ADB)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
28 28 order Judgment ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/16 3:55 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the accompanying order, judgment is hereby entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/16 3:50 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall distribute the interpleaded funds of $101,369.63 along with any accumulated interest to crossclaimant Shirley Olson. The crossclaimant shall complete IRS Form W-9 and submit the completed form to the Clerk of the Court via email at NEDml_FinancialAdmin@ned.uscourts.gov so that funds may be distributed. The January 18, 2023 status report deadline is terminated. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (E-mailed to Finance)(ADB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
26 26 oth_ans Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 11/14 5:47 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint regarding: Complaint,1 by Anne Valgora (Chaloupka, Maren)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
24 24 oth_doc Status Report Mon 07/18 11:23 AM
STATUS REPORT by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Cross Defendant Anne Valgora. (JAB)
Related: [-]
order Order - Text Only ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Mon 07/18 11:30 AM
TEXT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/18/2023 pursuant to Order20 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
23 23 oth_doc Status Report Fri 01/07 11:36 AM
STATUS REPORT by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Cross Defendant Anne Valgora.(JAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
22 22 order Order - Text Only ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Thu 07/01 2:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/3/2022. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
Related: [-]
21 21 oth_doc Status Report Thu 07/01 11:52 AM
STATUS REPORT by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Cross Defendant Anne Valgora.(LRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Thu 12/31 1:28 PM
ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's findings and recommendation (filing18 ) are adopted. New York Life Insurance Company is terminated as a party to this case. This case is administratively closed pending resolution of State v. Anne M. Valgora, Case No. CR 19-651, in the District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska. Counsel for Valgora is directed to report to the Court every 6 months regarding the status of the state court proceedings. The Clerk of the Court shall set an initial status report deadline of July 1, 2021 . Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 12/30 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Defendant Anne Valgora (Chaloupka, Maren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
18 18 motion Findings and Recommendation Tue 12/15 11:39 AM
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED to the Honorable John M. Gerrard, Chief United States District Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), that Plaintiff be dismissed as a party to this case and that this case be administratively closed pending disposition of State v. Anne Valgora (CI 19-651) in the District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska. The parties are notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the courts adoption of the recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
17 17 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/03 1:43 PM
ORDER Plaintiff may deposit a check in the amount of $101,369.63 with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. This represents the principal amount owed for the policy death benefit plus interest accrued as required by law. The Clerk is directed to deposit the aforementioned funds into an interest-bearing account until further order of this court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2041 and NECivR 67.1.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (E-mailed to Finance)(LRM)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 24, 2020
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Objection Sat 10/24 8:14 AM
ORDER on7 Motion to Stay and12 Objection to Stay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
15 15 cmp Crossclaim Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 10/23 4:02 PM
Olson's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Complaint,1 , CROSSCLAIM against Anne Valgora regarding Complaint,1 filed by New York Life Insurance Company by Shirley Olson Related [+]
Related: [-] isinger, James
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
14 14 order Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act Wed 10/14 4:08 PM
CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Setting Hearing or Trial Wed 10/14 3:49 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephone conference is set for 10/16/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conference instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
12 12 motion Objection Tue 10/13 2:31 PM
OBJECTION Opposition Brief to Motion to Stay Proceedings by Attorney Patrick E. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff New York Life Insurance Company.(McNamara, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Evidence Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Affidavit Declaration,
Att: 7 Appendix Table of Contents + Authorities
Monday, October 12, 2020
11 11 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/12 7:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion. On or before October 23, 2020, Defendant Shirley Olson, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steve Olson shall file an Answer or response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/12 11:23 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION Permission to answer out of time by Attorney James E. Reisinger on behalf of Defendant Shirley Olson Related [+]
Related: [-] isinger, James
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/12 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney James E. Reisinger on behalf of Defendant Shirley Olson Related [+]
Related: [-] isinger, James
Monday, September 28, 2020
8 8 oth_doc Index Mon 09/28 5:39 PM
INDEX in support of MOTION to Stay 7 by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Defendant Anne Valgora.(Chaloupka, Maren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
7 7 motion Stay Mon 09/28 5:38 PM
MOTION to Stay by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Defendant Anne Valgora.(Chaloupka, Maren)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 5:35 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Anne Valgora (Chaloupka, Maren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/08 2:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Shirley Olson. Waiver sent on 7/22/2020. Related [+]
Related: [-] isinger, James
Thursday, June 25, 2020
4 4 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/25 11:04 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff New York Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
3 3 oth_doc Supplement Wed 06/24 2:32 PM
SUPPLEMENT Exhibits A, B, and C of Complaint by Attorney Patrick E. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff New York Life Insurance Company.(McNamara, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Tue 06/23 3:00 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/23 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4183125), by Attorney Patrick E. McNamara on behalf of New York Life Insurance Company(McNamara, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Rule 7.1 Statement,
Att: 2 Supplement Rule 7.1 Statement Second Copy