Massachusetts District Court
Judge:George A Otoole, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-11214
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 20, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Dec 20, 2020 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
Mr. Allen Gessen
1537 Sudbury Road
Concord, MA 01742
Represented By
Wendy O. Hickey
Nissenbaum Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Priscilla Chigariro
Represented By
Abbigail W. Shirk
Metrowest Legal Services
contact info

GPO Jun 26 2020
Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: The 5 Motion under the Hague Convention for Entry of an Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling an Expedited Preliminary Injunction Hearing is GRANTED in part. (Halley, Taylor)
GPO Jun 11 2021
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered denying 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Lyness, Paul)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, December 20, 2021
95 95 1 pgs order Judgment Mon 12/20 2:48 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
94 94 6 pgs order Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Mon 12/20 12:12 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]