Original Case: 1:16-cv-00540

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv.pr-01683
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 03, 2021
Last checked: Monday Dec 06, 2021 3:29 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
DEBORAH ROSE
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TRACY STEPHENS
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ERIC HORNBERGER
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JILL TURGEON
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRENDA SHERIDAN
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEFFREY MORSE
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM FOX
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN KUESTERS
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOY MALONEY
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ERIC DEKENIPP
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SUZANNE G. DEVLIN
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LOUDOUN COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
Represented By
Julia Bougie Judkins
BANCROFT, MCGAVIN, HORVATH & JUDKINS PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIAN DAVISON
Represented By
Michael Allen Bragg
contact info
Fenlene Hsu Edrington
MORETON & EDRINGTON, PLC
contact info

GPO Dec 03 2021
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00540-AJT-MSN. [1001069337]. [20-1683]

Docket last updated: 12/06/2021 3:28 AM EST
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00540-AJT-MSN. Case manager: JeffNeal. 20-1683 JSN [Entered: 06/23/2020 10:50 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00540-AJT-MSN. 20-1683 JSN [Entered: 06/23/2020 10:52 AM]
Related: [-]