Washington Western District Court
Judge:Thomas S Zilly
Case #: 2:20-cv-00983
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2020
Terminated:Feb 16, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 21, 2020 12:56 AM PST
Amicus
National Police Association
Represented By
James L Buchal
Murphy & Buchal
contact info
Defendant
City of Seattle
Represented By
Joseph Givon Groshong
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kristin Elizabeth Ballinger
Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen LLP
contact info
Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen LLP
contact info
Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Onyx Homeowners Association
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
12th and Pike Associates LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
The Richmark Company
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sway and Cake LLC
Represented By
Patricia A Eakes
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Magdalena Sky
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Shuffle LLC
Represented By
Patricia A Eakes
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
SRJ Enterprises
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Redside Partners LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rancho Bravo, Inc
Represented By
Patricia A Eakes
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Ploszaj
Represented By
Patricia A Eakes
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Argento LLC
Represented By
Patricia A Eakes
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Olive St Apartments LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Northwest Liquor and Wine LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Madrona Real Estate Services LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Madrona Real Estate Investors VI LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Madrona Real Estate Investors IV LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Hunters Capital LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Wade Biller
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bergmans Lock and Key Services LLC
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Sage Physical Therapy PLLC
Terminated: 10/29/2020
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen Caples
Terminated: 10/29/2020
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Henry Charles Phillips
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Tyler Weaver
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 16, 2023
182 182 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/16 10:36 AM
ORDER: OF DISMISSAL: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
181 181 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 02/15 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant City of Seattle (Cramer, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
180 180 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/13 8:11 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Seattle, to171 MOTION to Exclude PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S EXPERT SETH STOUGHTON .(Iverson, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
179 179 respm Declaration Mon 02/13 8:09 PM
DECLARATION of Erica R. Iverson filed by Defendant City of Seattle re169 MOTION to Exclude PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S EXPERT BATES MCKEE, III(Iverson, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
178 178 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/13 8:07 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Seattle, to169 MOTION to Exclude PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S EXPERT BATES MCKEE, III .(Iverson, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
177 177 respm Declaration Mon 02/13 7:58 PM
DECLARATION of TYLER WEAVER filed by Plaintiffs 12th and Pike Associates LLC, Bergmans Lock and Key Services LLC, Wade Biller, Greenus Building Inc, Hunters Capital LLC, Hunters Property Holdings LLC, Madrona Real Estate Investors IV LLC, Madrona Real Estate Investors VI LLC, Madrona Real Estate Services LLC, Olive St Apartments LLC, Onyx Homeowners Association, Matthew Ploszaj, Redside Partners LLC, SRJ Enterprises, Shuffle LLC, Sway and Cake LLC, The Richmark Company re173 MOTION to Exclude Testimony By Plaintiffs' Experts Shane, Piza, and Van Zandt (Weaver, Tyler)
Related: [-]
176 176 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/13 7:49 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs 12th and Pike Associates LLC, Bergmans Lock and Key Services LLC, Wade Biller, Greenus Building Inc, Hunters Capital LLC, Hunters Property Holdings LLC, Madrona Real Estate Investors IV LLC, Madrona Real Estate Investors VI LLC, Madrona Real Estate Services LLC, Olive St Apartments LLC, Onyx Homeowners Association, Matthew Ploszaj, Redside Partners LLC, SRJ Enterprises, Shuffle LLC, Sway and Cake LLC, The Richmark Company, to173 MOTION to Exclude Testimony By Plaintiffs' Experts Shane, Piza, and Van Zandt . (Weaver, Tyler)
Related: [-]