California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robin Riblet
Case #: 9:11-bk-10544
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2011
Dismissed:Aug 23, 2012
Terminated:Sep 12, 2012

Debtor
Tomzilla, Inc
3038 Summit Cir
Santa Rosa Valley, CA 93012-9315
Represented By
Rennee R Dehesa
Schneiders & Associates LLP
contact info
William E Winfield
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
21051 Warner Center Lane, Suite 115
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Brian D Fittipaldi
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2013 8:47 PM PDT
Friday, February 04, 2011
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(9:11-bk-10544) [misc,volp11] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18641298. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by Tomzilla, Inc (Winfield, William). CORRECTION: Incomplete alias type for debtor entered. Debtor's aliases have been updated to reflect PDF. Incorrect debtor type entered. Debtor type is corporation. Modified on 2/7/2011 (Alcala, Maria).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule Schedule D, Statement of Financial Affairs
2 2 Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Action by Joint Written Consent Filed by Debtor Tomzilla, Inc. (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Tomzilla, Inc. Filed by Debtor Tomzilla, Inc. (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Automatic Stay with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tomzilla, Inc. (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 Emergency motion for Order Authorizing Interim Use of Cash Collateral; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Gary Nepa in Support Thereof with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tomzilla, Inc (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 Emergency motion Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Employee Payroll Expenses, Setting Insider Compensation and Other Administrative Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Nepa in Support Thereof with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tomzilla, Inc (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Setting Insider Compensation for Gary Nepa with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tomzilla, Inc. (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice Setting Insider Compensation for Doria Bartolucci with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tomzilla, Inc. (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]