New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:20-cv-04901
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2020
Terminated:Sep 29, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 22, 2020 5:58 AM EST
Defendant
Weathertech Direct, LLC
One Macneil Court
Bolingbrook, IL 60440
Plaintiff
Yony Sosa
On Behalf of Himself and All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates 150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
15 15 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/22 8:46 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Weathertech Direct, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Weathertech Direct, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Donati, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/30 3:03 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR APPLICATIONS TO RESTORE THE ACTION IS EXTENDED BY 30 DAYS. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(kye)(Text Only Order)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
13 13 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/25 1:55 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to complete settlement agreement addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jeffrey Gottlieb dated Nov. 25, 2020. Document filed by Yony Sosa..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/27 10:40 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR APPLICATIONS TO RESTORE THE ACTION IS EXTENDED BY 30 DAYS. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
11 11 motion Extension of Time Mon 10/26 6:18 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to complete settlement agreement addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jeffrey Gottlieb dated Oct. 26, 2020. Document filed by Yony Sosa..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 09/29 9:00 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. All filing deadlines and conference dates are adjourned sine die. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/28/2020) (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 09/24 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Settlement with prejudice . Document filed by Yony Sosa..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
8 8 order Order Thu 08/27 9:30 AM
ORDER. IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFF'S STATUS LETTER DATED AUGUST 26, 2020, DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 28, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(kye)(Text Only Order)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
7 7 misc Status Report Wed 08/26 2:39 PM
STATUS REPORT. and Extension for Defendant to respond Document filed by Yony Sosa..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 08/17 6:08 PM
ORDER: Defendant was served on July 7, 2020. However, no appearance has been entered on Defendant's behalf, and no response to the complaint has been filed in the allotted time. Plaintiff has not moved for a default judgment. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court whether it intends to move for default judgment, or if it has received any communication from Defendant or its counsel regarding a response to the complaint. If Plaintiff fails by August 31, 2020, to either (1) file a letter concerning the status of the case, or (2) move for default judgment against Defendant, the action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order by mail on Defendant. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 8/31/2020.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/17/2020) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 07/10 6:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Weathertech Direct, LLC served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was accepted by Janelle Denny, Dir. of Human Resources. Document filed by Yony Sosa..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 06/26 10:17 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Weathertech Direct, LLC..(dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 06/26 10:11 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 445 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 446 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 06/26 10:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 06/26 10:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 06/26 10:13 AM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/25 10:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Weathertech Direct, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Yony Sosa..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/25 10:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/25 10:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Weathertech Direct, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20429553)Document filed by Yony Sosa..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]