Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:00-bk-00113
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2000
Terminated:Jun 10, 2014
Plan Confirmed:Apr 30, 2002

Debtor
Mariner Post-Acute Network, Inc.
1 Ravinia Dr Ste 1500
Atlanta, GA 30346-2115
Represented By
Shannon Stacy Frazier
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Elliott Greenleaf
contact info
Etta Rena Wolfe
Smith Katzenstein & Furlow LLP
contact info
Jason M. Madron
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
William Pierce Bowden
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Thomas L. Ambro
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Rebecca L. Booth
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Noel C. Burnham
Burnham Law Associates, LLC
contact info
Christopher Dean Loizides
Loizides, P.A.
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Paul G. Preston
Preston & Cowan LLP
contact info
Bruce Grohsgal
Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl Young & Jones
contact info
Russell C. Silberglied
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 757 Third Ave Third Floor
New York, NY 10017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
U.S. Trustee
Don A. Beskrone
Terminated: 02/26/2014
Office of the U.S. Trustee 844 King Street Suite 2313
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Friday, November 21, 2014
7181 7181 Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 18, 2014
7180 7180 Final Claims Register Numerical Registers 3 of 3 . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Persaud, Tony)
Related: [-]
7179 7179 Final Claims Register Numerical Registers 2 of 3 . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Persaud, Tony)
Related: [-]
7178 7178 Final Claims Register Numerical Registers 1 of 2 . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Persaud, Tony)
Related: [-]
7177 7177 Final Claims Register Alphabetical Register . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Persaud, Tony)
Related: [-]