Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-11505 |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2020 |
Dismissed: | Aug 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 09/28 11:07 AM
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
48 | 48
12
pgs
misc
Operating Report
Fri 09/25 10:14 AM
Operating Report / Revised Monthly Operating Report for the Period August 1, 2020 through August 10, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
47 | 47
misc
Operating Report
Fri 09/25 10:13 AM
Operating Report / Revised Monthly Operating Report for the Period July 1, 2020 through July 31, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
46 | 46
misc
Operating Report
Fri 09/25 10:11 AM
Operating Report / Revised Monthly Operating Report for the Period June 26, 2020 through June 30, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 09/23 8:11 AM
Case Closed. (Cappiello, Karen) |
||
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Operating Report
Mon 08/24 9:05 AM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period August 1, 2020 through August 10, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
44 | 44
misc
Operating Report
Mon 08/24 9:03 AM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period July 1, 2020 through July 31, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss
Thu 08/13 12:14 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss . Notice Date 08/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 08/11 9:45 AM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
3
pgs
order
Motion, Dismiss Case
Mon 08/10 2:45 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case & Terminating Claims Agent signed on 8/10/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
3
pgs
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/07 12:43 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Evan C Hollander on behalf of Ad Hoc Bondholders Group. (Hollander, Evan) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
4
pgs
ans
Statement
Thu 08/06 1:33 PM
Statement (Verified Statement pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019) filed by Raniero D'Aversa on behalf of Ad Hoc Bondholders Group. (D'Aversa, Raniero) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 08/06 1:25 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Raniero D'Aversa on behalf of Ad Hoc Bondholders Group. (D'Aversa, Raniero) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/20 1:03 PM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 07/17 7:11 PM
Notice of Dismissal / Re-Notice of Hearing on Dismissal of Chapter 11 Case and Adjournment of Hearing Previously Scheduled for August 4, 2020 filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. with hearing to be held on 8/10/2020 (check with court for location) Objections due by 8/3/2020, (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/16 4:15 PM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
34 | 34
18
pgs
misc
Matrix
Thu 07/16 2:46 PM
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Creditor Matrix Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
13
pgs
misc
Operating Report
Wed 07/15 7:16 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period June 26, 2020 through June 30, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 07/15 3:16 PM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 07/14 4:21 PM
Notice of Hearing on Dismissal of Chapter 11 Case and Adjournment of Matters Previously Scheduled for July 28, 2020 filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. with hearing to be held on 8/4/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Objections due by 7/28/2020, (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Motion, Dismiss Case
Tue 07/14 2:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case / Debtor's Motion for Entry of Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/13 9:58 AM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/13 9:44 AM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Thu 07/09 10:12 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 07/07 10:14 PM
Letter to the Hon. Shelley C. Chapman dated July 7, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 07/06 12:36 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Hiram Gutierrez on behalf of City of Weslaco, Weslaco ISD & La Joya ISD. (Gutierrez, Hiram) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Thu 07/02 3:37 PM
Letter to the Hon. Shelley C. Chapman dated July 2, 2020 Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 07/01 9:20 PM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 07/01 5:32 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service filed by Francisco Vazquez on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. (Vazquez, Francisco) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order RE: Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Tue 06/30 4:20 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Extension of Time for, and Upon Plan Confirmation Waiving Requirement of, Filing Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs signed on 6/30/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
20 | 20
order
Motion. Authorize
Tue 06/30 4:17 PM
Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of Order (A) Authorizing (I) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, (II) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, and (III) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (B) Authorizing Continued Performance Under Intercompany Transactions and Historical Practices, (C) Granting Extension of Section 345(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, and (D) Granting Related Relief signed on 6/30/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
19 | 19
35
pgs
order
Motion, Approve
Tue 06/30 3:46 PM
Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Hearing to Consider the Adequacy of the Disclosure Statement and Confirmation of the Joint Plan; (II) Approving Form and Manner of Notice of Combined Hearing; (III) Approving Solicitation Procedures; and (IV) Granting Related Relief signed on 6/30/2020; with hearing to be held Telephonically on 7/28/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (White, Greg) |
|
18 | 18
20
pgs
order
Order RE: Application, Employ
Tue 06/30 3:13 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain and Employ Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date signed on 6/30/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Motion, Approve Use of Cash Collateral
Tue 06/30 3:04 PM
Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral on Non-Consensual Basis, (B) Granting Adequate Protection, (C) Scheduling Final Hearing, and (D) Granting Related Relief signed on 6/30/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
16 | 16
order
Motion. Authorize
Tue 06/30 2:59 PM
Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Pay Unimpaired Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business signed on 6/30/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 06/29 10:58 PM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Hearing
Mon 06/29 10:36 AM
Notice of Hearing / Revised Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Case, Filing of First Day Pleadings and First Day Hearing filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2020 (check with court for location) (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 06/29 8:12 AM
Affidavit of Service of David Rodriguez of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Agenda
Fri 06/26 5:56 PM
Notice of Agenda , Notice of Hearing / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Case, Filing of First Day Pleadings and First Day Hearing filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Declaration
Fri 06/26 5:19 PM
Declaration of Paloma Elizabeth Arellano Bujanda in Support of First Day Motions and Applications in Compliance with Local Rule 1007-2 filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Motion, Approve
Fri 06/26 4:41 PM
Motion to Approve / Debtor's Motion for Entry of Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Hearing to Consider the Adequacy of the Disclosure Statement and Confirmation of the Joint Plan; (II) Approving Form and Manner of Notice of Combined Hearing; (III) Approving Solicitation Procedures; and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Motion, Approve Use of Cash Collateral
Fri 06/26 4:39 PM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral / Debtor's Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, and 363 for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral on Non-Consensual Basis, (B) Granting Adequate Protection, (C) Scheduling Final Hearing, and (D) Granting Related Relief filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Motion, Authorize
Fri 06/26 4:36 PM
Motion to Authorize / Debtor's Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363, and 503 for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Pay Unimpaired Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Motion, Authorize
Fri 06/26 3:21 PM
Motion to Authorize / Debtor's Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 345, and 363 for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing (I) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, (II) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, and (III) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (B) Authorizing Continued Performance Under Intercompany Transactions and Historical Practices, (C) Granting Extension of Section 345(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, and (D) Granting Related Relief filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
6 | 6
13
pgs
motion
Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Fri 06/26 3:14 PM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules / Debtor's Motion for Extension of Time for, and Upon Plan Confirmation Waiving Requirement of, Filing Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
5 | 5
43
pgs
motion
Application, Employ
Fri 06/26 3:10 PM
Application to Employ Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
4 | 4
35
pgs
answer
Declaration
Fri 06/26 2:12 PM
Declaration of Jane Sullivan on Behalf of Epiq Corporate Restructuring Regarding Service of Solicitation Packages and Tabulation of Ballots Cast on the Prepackaged Plan of Reorganization of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V. Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
3 | 3
257
pgs
plan
Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/26 2:07 PM
Disclosure Statement / Disclosure Statement for the Prepackaged Plan of Reorganization of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V. Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
2 | 2
37
pgs
plan
Chapter 11 Plan
Fri 06/26 2:04 PM
Chapter 11 Plan / Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan filed by Pedro A. Jimenez on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 06/26 1:51 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/26/2020, Disclosure Statement due by 10/26/2020, Initial Case Conference due by 7/27/2020, Filed by Pedro A. Jimenez of Paul Hastings LLP on behalf of Grupo Famsa, S.A.B. de C.V.. (Jimenez, Pedro) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 06/26 1:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-11505 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14093763. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Fri 06/26 2:17 PM
Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Su, Kevin) |