Tierney v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-04211 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Northern, 3:20-cv-00967 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 20, 2020 12:26 AM PST |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colleen Tierney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Mon 10/16 3:55 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED MDL 2741: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, civil case no. 3:20-cv-04211-VC Tierney v. Monsanto Company is terminated. cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Colleen Tierney (Merillat, Wesley) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO MOVE CASES re 17281 , 17282 , 17283 , 17291 , and 17315 . Associated Cases: 16-md-2741; 20-cv-4211; 20-cv-6989; 20-cv-8850; 21-cv-5317; 19-cv-5238. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/26/2023. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION TO MOVE CASE TO WAVE 7b (Unopposed) filed by Colleen Tierney. Responses due by 9/27/2023. Replies due by 10/4/2023.(Merillat, Wesley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting (15488) Motion in case 3:16-md-02741-VC; granting (11) Motion in case 3:20-cv-04211-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MOVE CASE TO WAVE VI filed by Colleen Tierney. Responses due by 9/30/2022. Replies due by 10/7/2022.(Merillat, Wesley) Modified on 9/16/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION AS TO GOVERNING STATE LAW filed by Colleen Tierney. (Merillat, Wesley) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Colleen Tierney. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Merillat, Wesley) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00967. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 06/26 8:30 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741 Northern District of Ohio, 3:20-cv-00967 JZ, Tierney v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-04211 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 216 cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L) | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) | ||
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L) |