South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Helen E Burris
Case #: 7:11-bk-00721
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2011
Converted:Dec 28, 2011
Discharged:Jul 09, 2012
Terminated:Mar 08, 2013

Debtor
Keith Arnold Kobe
212 Hammond Rd
Greenwood, SC 29646-9414
Represented By
Robert H. Cooper
contact info
Debtor
Janice Kay Kobe
212 Hammond Rd
Greenwood, SC 29646
Represented By
Robert H. Cooper
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randy A. Skinner
300 N. Main Street Suite 201A
Greenville, SC 29601
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201
Represented By
Linda Barr
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info
Joseph F Buzhardt, III
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
John Timothy Stack
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2013 11:54 PM EDT
Friday, February 04, 2011
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) 11-00721 [misc,volp11ac] (1039.00). Receipt Number 5975985, amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Robert H. Cooper on behalf of Keith Arnold Kobe, Janice Kay Kobe. Deadline for Filing Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement ends 08/3/2011. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Bankruptcy Form 21 SSN. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS. Filed by Robert H. Cooper on behalf of Janice Kay Kobe, Keith Arnold Kobe. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines. Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/18/2011 at 11:30 AM at Spartanburg. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 05/17/2011. Proofs of Claim or Interest due by 06/16/2011.
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Robert H. Cooper on behalf of Janice Kay Kobe, Keith Arnold Kobe. (Cooper, Robert)
Related: [-]