California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Geraldine Mund
Case #: 1:11-bk-11547
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Mar 10, 2011
Dismissed:Dec 31, 2014
Terminated:Apr 26, 2017

Debtor
Kayla 16, LLC
3701 Royal Meadow Rd
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-4830
Represented By
Raymond H Aver
Law Offices Of Raymond H Aver Apc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
21051 Warner Center Lane, Suite 115
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Jennifer L Braun
contact info
S Margaux Ross
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
185 185 court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 04/26 10:30 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. Related [+] (Ogier, Kathy)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Kayla 16, LLC,15 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12,20 Generic Motion filed by Creditor JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.,22 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Kayla 16, LLC,39 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A., Update Proof of Claim Deadline,50 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Kayla 16, LLC,51 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Kayla 16, LLC,52 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Kayla 16, LLC,54 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.,69 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Kayla 16, LLC,97 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV),133 Stipulation filed by Debtor Kayla 16, LLC