Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:20-cv-11240
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2020
Terminated:Apr 26, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 26, 2020 5:35 AM EST
Counter Claimant
ALEX MUKASA
Represented By
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Counter Claimant
PAUL NYANZI
Represented By
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Counter Claimant
Next Door Transport
Represented By
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Counter Defendant
NELSON ARAUJO
Represented By
Joseph deMello
Law Office Of Joseph F. Demello, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
ALEX MUKASA
Represented By
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Counter Defendant
PAUL NYANZI
Represented By
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Defendant
ALEX MUKASA
Represented By
Christopher R. O'Hara
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Defendant
PAUL NYANZI
Represented By
Christopher R. O'Hara
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Defendant
Next Door Transport
Represented By
Christopher R. O'Hara
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info
Plaintiff
NELSON ARAUJO
Represented By
Joseph deMello
Law Office Of Joseph F. Demello, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, July 08, 2021
37 37 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 07/26 3:16 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Telephone Conference held on 7/8/2021. The parties state the status regarding the settlement and previous attorneys liens, and make an oral motion to extend the time to finalize the settlement. The court allows the motion to extend in open court to 9/14/21. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
36 36 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/06 1:45 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.A Telephone Conference has been set for 7/8/2021 03:00 PM before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Counsel may appear by dialing 888-675-2535 access code 9123576. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 07/01 9:54 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 14, 2021 to Finalize Settlement Terms. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
34 34 motion Extension of Time Wed 06/30 3:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 14, 2021 to Finalize Settlement Terms by ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport.(Passanisi, Lucia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/16 8:33 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2021 to Finalize Settlement Terms. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
32 32 motion Extension of Time Tue 06/15 8:12 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2021 to Finalize Settlement Terms by ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport.(Passanisi, Lucia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/26 11:23 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 16, 2021 to Finalize settlement terms. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
30 30 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/25 11:18 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 16, 2021 to Finalize settlement terms by ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport.(Passanisi, Lucia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
29 29 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Mon 04/26 2:26 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. 30-DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL & CLOSING ORDER(Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
28 28 order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 04/09 2:44 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. 23 Plaintiff's First MOTION to Compel production of documents is DENIED except as to the supplementation Defendant specifically agreed to in the opposition. The parties shall forthwith submit a proposed protective order to govern the confidential documents that have been and may in the future be disclosed. (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
27 27 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 03/26 3:24 PM
Opposition re23 First MOTION to Compel production of documents filed by Next Door Transport.(Passanisi, Lucia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Friday, March 19, 2021
26 26 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 03/19 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Joseph deMello (deMello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/15 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Gagliardi on behalf of NELSON ARAUJO (Gagliardi, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
24 24 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 03/12 2:30 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re23 First MOTION to Compel production of documents filed by NELSON ARAUJO.(deMello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 1 NDTs response
23 23 motion Compel Fri 03/12 2:28 PM
First MOTION to Compel production of documents by NELSON ARAUJO.(deMello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1 Fri 03/12 2:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 for motion to compel by Joseph deMello on behalf of NELSON ARAUJO by on behalf of NELSON ARAUJO.(deMello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 02/01 2:14 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Status Conference currently scheduled for 4/21/2021 is reset for 5/24/2021 at 02:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
20 20 utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/01 12:11 PM
Reset Deadlines: Fact discovery to be completed by 5/15/2021 (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Amend Mon 02/01 12:00 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting18 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/15/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
18 18 motion Amend Fri 01/29 4:59 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend14 Scheduling Order, by ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport.(Passanisi, Lucia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/27 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucia A. Passanisi on behalf of ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport (Passanisi, Lucia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 24, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/24 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. O'Hara on behalf of ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport (O'Hara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
15 15 misc Status Report Mon 10/26 1:56 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by NELSON ARAUJO. (deMello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/23 5:14 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures due by 9/11/2020; amendment to pleadings due by 10/30/2020; request for production of documents to be served by 12/4/2020; request for admissions to be served by 1/25/2021; depositions to be completed by 3/5/2021; fact discovery to be completed by 4/15/2021; status report due by 10/30/2020. A Status Conference is set for 4/21/2021 at 2:15 PM.(Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 09/18 12:26 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Scheduling Conference held on 9/15/2020. Counsel state the status of the case. Plaintiff allegedly sexually harassed a customer resulting in the loss of a significant customer. Damages estimated around $14,000. Counsel discuss counterclaims, mediation and the proposed schedule. The court will adopt the proposed schedule, requests a status report by 10/30/20 and sets a status conference for 4/21/21 at 2:00pm. Initial disclosures by 9/11/2020. Amendments to the pleadings by 10/30/20. All request for production of documents by 12/4/20. Request for admission 1/25/21. Depositions complete by 3/5/21. Final fact discovery by 4/15/21. Status report by 10/30/20. A status conference has been set for 4/21/21 at 2:00pm. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . ( Status Conference set for 4/21/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.). (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 09/11 5:20 PM
Nelson Araujo Reply to CClaim ANSWER to Counterclaim by NELSON ARAUJO.(deMello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Rescheduling Tue 09/08 4:46 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING The Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 3:00pm has been reset to 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
10 10 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Thu 09/03 5:03 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 scheduling conference memo . (deMello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
9 9 order Order on Motion to Amend Wed 08/12 11:10 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. 8 Motion to Amend 6 Answer to Complaint is ALLOWED AS UNOPPOSED. (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
8 8 motion Amend Fri 07/17 12:33 PM
MOTION to Amend6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport.(Loventhal, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Mon 07/13 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 9/15/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Scheduling order sample,
Att: 2 standing order on summary judgment
Thursday, July 09, 2020
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 07/09 9:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against NELSON ARAUJO by Next Door Transport, ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI.(Loventhal, Robert) Modified on 7/9/2020 to correct description of the pleading on the docket(Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of service
Monday, June 29, 2020
5 5 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Mon 06/29 3:39 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 06/29 3:11 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by ALEX MUKASA. Acknowledgment filed by ALEX MUKASA. (Loventhal, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 06/29 2:54 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/29 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Loventhal on behalf of ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport(Loventhal, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of service
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 06/29 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALEX MUKASA, PAUL NYANZI, Next Door Transport ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8306382 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Loventhal, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced and Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2020: #2 Exhibit - State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form) (Baker, Casey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of service