O'Connor v. Kazimer et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas M Parker |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01429 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 26, 2020 5:10 AM EST |
Defendant
City of Cleveland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kazimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan O'Connor
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Frank Jackson
Terminated: 08/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael McGrath
Terminated: 08/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Calvin Williams
Terminated: 08/13/2020
Chief 10404 Lamontier
Cleveland, OH 44103 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1-5
Terminated: 08/13/2020
|
1. | Man who alleges assault during Cleveland protest files federal lawsuit (fox8.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/30/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Marginal Entry Order : This case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to stipulation of the parties (ECF Doc.27 ). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/20/2021. (D,JJ) |
|
Thursday, August 19, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Following Settlement filed by City of Cleveland. (Puin, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
order
Order
Thu 08/05 8:36 AM
Order [non-document]: The parties have advised the court that they have settled the matters in dispute. Based upon this representation, the parties shall execute a final settlement agreement within fourteen (14) days from the date of this entry and file a Stipulation for Dismissal of all claims with prejudice not later than thirty (30) days from the date of this entry. IT IS SO ORDERED. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/5/2021. (D,JJ) |
||
Wednesday, July 07, 2021 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 07/07 11:55 AM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. The court held a telephone status conference on 7/7/2021 at 10:30 AM. Attorney Eric Long participated on behalf of plaintiff Ryan O'Connor. Attorney Timothy Puin participated on behalf of the dismissed City defendants. And attorney Craig Morice participated on behalf of defendant Officer John Kazimer. Counsel noted the possibility that a second amended complaint would likely bring the City defendants back into the case and indicated that they would like to pause the case before proceeding with amended pleadings and discovery. Counsel for the defendants said that there was a good chance for settlement within the next few weeks, and asked that the court pause the case schedule while those discussions are happening. See Order, filed separately. (Court Reporter: N/A. Time: 10 minutes). (D,JJ) |
||
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order
Wed 07/07 12:00 PM
Order [non-document]: The case management schedule set on December 11, 2020 is VACATED (ECF Doc.20 ). The parties shall submit a proposed case management schedule and/or status report on their settlement efforts on or before July 30, 2021. If the parties are unable to reach settlement by July 30, 2021, Plaintiff O'Connor shall file his second amended complaint no later than August 15, 2021. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 7/7/2021. (D,JJ) |
||
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Tue 06/29 10:58 AM
IMPORTANT Notice [non-document]: Status Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 10:30 AM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Call-in instructions will be emailed to the parties. (D,JJ) |
||
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Order : Defendant City of Cleveland's motion for judgment on the pleadings (ECF Doc.19 ) is GRANTED as to each of plaintiff O'Connor's Monell claims and his requests for punitive, injunctive, and mandamus relief. And plaintiff O'Connor's request for leave to file a second amended complaint (ECF Doc.21 ) is GRANTED. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 6/21/2021. (D,JJ) |
|
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Withdrawal filed by Ryan O'Connor. (Gedeon, Sara) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Withdrawal filed by Ryan O'Connor. (Malik, David) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Attorney Appearance by Tiana Bohanon filed by on behalf of Ryan O'Connor. (Bohanon, Tiana) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Motion for leave to file reply brief instanter filed by Defendant City of Cleveland. Related document(s)19 .(Puin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order on Motion for leave
Tue 02/02 8:32 AM
Order [non-document]: Defendant City of Cleveland's motion to file a reply brief instanter (ECF Doc.22 ) is GRANTED. Defendant City of Cleveland's reply brief (ECF Doc.22 -1) is deemed filed on the date of this order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 2/2/2021. (D,JJ) |
||
Sunday, January 31, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Opposition to19 Motion for judgment on the pleadings with memorandum in support filed by All Plaintiffs.(Long, Eric) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. The deadline for responding to the defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is January 31, 2021. A reply brief may be filed with leave of court. The deadline for completing expert and fact discovery is September 30, 2021. The deadline for plaintiff's expert reports is May 31, 2021. The deadline for defendants' expert reports is July 30, 2021. Amendments to the pleadings and addition of parties shall be made by rule. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is September 30, 2021, with responses and replies by rule. A status conference may be scheduled upon request. A final status hearing and trial date will be set at a later time. The court encourages the parties and counsel to continue to discuss the possibility of settlement while the case is progressing. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 12/11/2020. (D,JJ) |
|
minutes
Case Management Conference
Fri 12/11 10:28 AM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. On December 11, 2020, the court held a case management conference with plaintiff's counsel Sara Gedeon and counsel for defendants Elena Boop, Craig Morice and Timothy Puin. During the conference, the court discussed the parties' plan for discovery and dispositive motions. The deadlines will be reflected in the court's case management plan/order, filed separately. (Court Reporter: N/A. Time: 25 minutes). (D,JJ) |
||
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Motion for judgment on the pleadings with memorandum in support filed by Defendant City of Cleveland. (Puin, Timothy) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Mon 11/23 10:23 AM
IMPORTANT Notice [non-document]: The Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2020 has been RESCHEDULED for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Call-in instructions will be emailed to the parties separately. Related document(s)15 . (D,JJ) |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for further proceedings. Related Document17 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/14/2020. (R,Sh) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Ryan O'Connor.(Gedeon, Sara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 10/14 1:04 PM
Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. Related document(s)18 . (Y,A) |
||
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/24/2020 at 03:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr., with counsel only. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/8/2020. (R,Sh) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Answer to7 Amended complaint filed by John Kazimer. (Morice, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/23/2020. (R,Sh) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Unopposed Motion for protective order filed by Defendant City of Cleveland.(Puin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Answer to7 Amended complaint filed by City of Cleveland. (Puin, Timothy) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ryan O'Connor. City of Cleveland waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 filed on behalf of Ryan O'Connor (Gedeon, Sara) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ryan O'Connor. John Kazimer waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 filed on behalf of Ryan O'Connor (Gedeon, Sara) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Withdrawal of Motion to Quash Service filed by City of Cleveland, Michael McGrath. Related document(s)6 .(Puin, Timothy) |
|
7 | 7
![]() First Amended complaint against City of Cleveland, John Kazimer. Filed by Ryan O'Connor. (Gedeon, Sara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Thu 08/06 8:57 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 3, 2020 to file responsive pleading. Related documents4 ,5 . Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/6/2020.(R,Sh) |
||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion to quash service on Michael McGrath with memorandum in support filed by City of Cleveland, Michael McGrath. Related document(s)3 .(Puin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 3, 2020 to answer or otherwise plead in response to complaint filed by City of Cleveland, Frank Jackson, Michael McGrath, Calvin Williams. Related document(s)1 . (Puin, Timothy) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 3, 2020 to file responsive pleading filed by Defendant John Kazimer. Related document(s)1 . (Boop, Elena) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Return of Service by personal service executed upon City of Cleveland on 7/10/2020; Frank Jackson on 7/10/2020; John Kazimer on 7/10/2020; Michael McGrath on 7/10/2020; Calvin Williams on 7/10/2020, filed on behalf of Ryan O'Connor (Gedeon, Sara) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Cleveland, Frank Jackson, John Kazimer, Michael McGrath, Calvin Williams. (L,MI) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10072858.. Filed by Ryan O'Connor. (Friedman, Ian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 06/29 2:39 PM
Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/29 2:43 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI) |