CATE STREET CAPITAL INC et al v. INDUSTRY INTELLIGENCE INC et al
Maine District Court | |
Judge: | John C Nivison |
Referred: | John C Nivison |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00200 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 15, 2014 10:01 PM EST |
Defendant
INDUSTRY INTELLIGENCE INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VERLE SUTTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CATE STREET CAPITAL INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN HALLE
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
GNP MAINE HOLDINGS LLC
Terminated: 10/15/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PJ PERRINO, JR
Terminated: 10/23/2014
|
Represented By
|