Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine D Perry
Case #: 4:14-cv-00917
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2014
Terminated:Feb 02, 2015
Last checked: Monday Dec 15, 2014 10:56 PM CST
Defendant
DOES 1-10, inclusive
Defendant
Valarity, LLC.
222 South Central Ave. Suite 901
St. Louis, MO 63105
Represented By
Dennis J. Barton, III
Barton Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joe Dean
Represented By
Andrew R. Magdy
The Law Office Of Andrew Magdy, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 02, 2015
17 17 order Order of Dismissal 41(b) Mon 02/02 1:39 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b), and for the parties' failure to comply with the Court's order of September 15, 2014, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, subject to any partys right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, to reopen the action for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court retains jurisdiction for sixty (60) days from the date of this order to enforce the settlement. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 02/02/2015. (CBL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
16 16 ORDER - The Court having been advised by counsel that this action has been settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the September 16, 2014 conference pursuant to Rule 16, Fed.R.Civ.P., is vacated and all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 10/15/2014. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on September 15, 2014. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 09, 2014
15 15 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Joe Dean. . (Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 13, 2014
14 14 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/9/2014. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/16/2014 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on August 13, 2014. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 12, 2014
13 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Valarity, LLC.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Barton, Dennis)
Related: [-]
12 12 ANSWER to1 Complaint by Valarity, LLC..(Barton, Dennis)
Related: [-]
11 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Dennis J. Barton, III for Defendant Valarity, LLC.. (Barton, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 30, 2014
10 10 Amended ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joe Dean. (Amendment to document #9 .)(Magdy, Andrew) Modified on 7/31/2014 (BRP).
Related: [-]
Monday, July 28, 2014
9 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joe Dean. Valarity, LLC. served on 7/23/2014, answer due 8/13/2014. (Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 22, 2014
8 8 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Valarity, LLC. The summons was emailed to Attorney Andrew Magdy. (CBL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 21, 2014
7 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Joe Dean Process Server: Charles E.N. Rosene (Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by Plaintiff Joe Dean.(Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
5 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Joe Dean as to Valarity, LLC.. (Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 08, 2014
4 4 1 pgs MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by Plaintiff Joe Dean. (Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2014
3 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Joe Dean Process Server: Charles E.N. Rosene (BAK)
Related: [-]
Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Andrew R. Magdy. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2014
2 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Joseph Dean. Parent companies: n/a, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Valarity, LLC. with receipt number 0865-4322309, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Joseph Dean.(Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Summons