South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Duncan
Case #: 2:11-bk-00756
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2011
Dismissed:May 25, 2011
Terminated:Jun 07, 2011

Debtor
STL Management, LLC
PO Box 2010
Mount Pleasant, SC 29465-2010
Represented By
Felix B. Clayton
Law Office Of Felix B. Clayton
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201
Represented By
Joseph F Buzhardt, III
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
John Timothy Stack
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2013 11:43 PM EDT
Monday, February 07, 2011
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) 11-00756 [misc,volp11ac] (1039.00). Receipt Number 5988481, amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Felix B. Clayton on behalf of STL Management, LLC. Deadline for Filing Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement ends 08/8/2011. (Clayton, Felix)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines. Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/01/2011 at 10:00 AM at Charleston. Last day to oppose dischargeability of certain debts is 05/31/2011. Proofs of Claim or Interest due by 06/30/2011.
Related: [-]