Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03042
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2020
Terminated:Sep 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC
Corporation Service Company 2710 Gateway Oaks Drive Suite 150 N.
Sacramento, CA 95833
Represented By
Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Thursday, September 17, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/17 11:39 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/17 11:33 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Case Management Action due after 10/1/2020. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
order Judge Docket Order Thu 09/17 12:10 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) In light of Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal of the action, the September 17, 2020 scheduling conference is hereby VACATED. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued,9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Dropped Thu 09/17 12:11 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] Off calendar per order on 9/17/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/17 3:22 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3042. (aw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/11 11:08 AM
Certificate of Service re Declaration of Jason B. Komorsky in support of Service of Summons & Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 7 Declaration
7 7 misc Declaration Fri 09/11 11:06 AM
Declaration of Jason B. Komorsky in in support of Service of Summons and Complaint of Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Summons Service Executed
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Tue 09/08 11:09 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is set to come before the court on September 17, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the complaint, summons (Dkt. 2), and certificate of service of process (Dkt. 6). Para. 9 of Plaintiffs complaint indicates that Deft. Vanderbilt Minerals LLC (VMLLC) is a DE limited liability company located at 33 Winfield Street, Norwalk, CT. Plaintiff's certificate of service of process indicates that Plaintiff served process on VMLLC on July 6, 2020 by first class mail sent to Corporation Service Company, 2710 Gateway Oaks Drive, Ste. 150 N, Sacramento, CA 95833. FRBP 7004(b)(3) permits service of process by first class mail on domestic corporations if sent to the attention of an officer, a managing or general agent, or a statutory agent for service of process. If sent to a statutory agent for service of process, and if applicable law so requires, process must also be sent to the defendant. Neither the complaint nor the certificate of service of process offer any explanation as to why service of process on VMLLC is valid or, assuming Corporation Service Company is VMLLC's statutory agent for service of process, whether applicable law requires Plaintiff to service VMLLC, too. The court cannot conclude that VMLLC has been properly served with process without additional information. Accordingly, the court ORDERS Plaintiff to file and serve no later than September 11, 2020, a declaration explaining why he believes that service of process is valid as to VMLLC. This will permit the court to determine whether VMLLC has been properly served prior to the September 17, 2020 scheduling conference. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, July 06, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/06 3:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC 7/6/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Tue 06/30 2:59 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lj)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 06/30 2:55 PM
Summons Issued on Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC Answer Due 7/30/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/17/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 12:20 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03042 . 11 Related [+] Complaint by James Gansman against Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet