Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:20-cv-01740
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2020
Terminated:Jul 02, 2020
Last checked: Monday Dec 28, 2020 6:20 AM CST
Defendant
Dallas Police
Defendant
Jos A Bank
Defendant
Ed Kinkeade
Defendant
Kranthi Purimetla
Defendant
Purchuri Raghavendra
Defendant
Sarfarosh Khan Saleen
Defendant
The Magonolia Motel
Defendant
Donald Trumph
Defendant
US Government
Plaintiff
Manogna Devabhaktuni
Lord of Lords et al 1818 Corsicana St
Dallas, TX 75201


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
6 6 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Wed 09/02 9:23 AM
Mail returned as undeliverable.5 Notice of Application of a Prior Sanction Order To Close New Case, received back from Manogna Devabhaktuni as No such number - unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Application of a Prior Sanction Order To Close New Case Thu 07/02 11:07 AM
Notice that the clerk has been instructed to apply the attached sanction order to the submissions indexed under number: 3:20-cv-1740-L-BN. The sanction order was originally filed in: 3:19cv-2216-G-BT & 3:19-cv-2240-M-BK and states: The complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff is hereby SANCTIONED and BARRED from proceeding in forma pauperis in any civil action in this court whether she files the action in this court, she files it in another court and it is removed to this court, or she files in another federal court and it is transferred to this court. That order prohibits the filing of a case, so the number assigned to this closed matter remains for indexing purposes only. (cea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
misc Order Receipt Thu 07/02 11:12 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Jul 2 11:12:57 CDT 2020 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 07/01 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manogna Devabhaktuni. (mjr)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/01 11:52 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Manogna Devabhaktuni. (mjr)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 07/01 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Dallas Police, Jos A Bank, Ed Kinkeade, Kranthi Purimetla, Purchuri Raghavendra, Sarfarosh Khan Saleen, The Magonolia Motel, Donald Trumph, US Government filed by Manogna Devabhaktuni. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Lindsay Wed 07/01 11:48 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) (mjr)
Related: [-]